EP1457920 - IC CARD READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun Nagano 393-8511 / JP | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun, Nagano 393-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Shigeyuki, c/o KK SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun, Nagano 393-8511 / JP | 02 /
TATAI, Toshio, c/o KK SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun, Nagano 393-8511 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazunori, c/o KK SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun, Nagano 393-8511 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham, NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02783575.0 | 20.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002JP12129 | Priority number, date | JP20010358385 | 22.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001358385 | [2004/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03044731 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457920 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457920 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00, G06K7/04, G06K7/00, G06K13/08 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G06K13/085 (EP,US);
G06K13/08 (EP,US);
G06K7/0021 (EP,US);
G06K7/0026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | G06K17/00, G06K7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IC-KARTENLESER | [2004/38] | English: | IC CARD READER | [2004/38] | French: | LECTEUR DE CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2004 | Translation filed | 10.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0295607 (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 26 * [A] 5; | [X]DE3916783 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]DE9400348U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 5 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0767440 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5* figure 11 *; | [A]EP0945816 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; figures 2,4 * | International search | [X]JPH08315088 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [X]JPH07175897 (ANRITSU CORP) |