EP1449362 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM, PROGRAM AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Motoki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Masanobu, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Kazuhiko 11-35-53, Kourigaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0084 / JP | 04 /
YAGI, Tomotaka 14-47-409, Takakura-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0872 / JP | 05 /
KELLY, Declan Patrick Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
VAN GESTEL, Wilhelmus, Jacobus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02783715.2 | 29.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002JP12560 | Priority number, date | JP20010365630 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001365630 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047244 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449362 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | "INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMMSPEICHERMEDIUM, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM" | [2004/35] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM, PROGRAM AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2004/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE DE PROGRAMMES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE PROGRAMMES ET DE DONNEES | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 22.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP09009137.2 / EP2112826 | EP09009138.0 / EP2114071 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]EP1206141 (SONY CORP) [PA] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US6041161 (OKAMOTO HIROO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6175683 (SUGIMURA NAOZUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 42 * * abstract *; | [X]US2001024336 (LOOIJKENS MARINUS ADRIANUS HEN [NL]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | WO0045388 | EP1103974 | US6269063 | US5987210 | US6199076 | US2001041053 | US5610653 |