EP1440195 - FABRIC FOR USE IN THE MANUFACTURE OF TISSUE PRODUCTS HAVING VISUALLY DISCERNABLE BACKGROUND TEXTURE REGIONS BORDERED BY CURVILINEAR DECORATIVE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURAZIN, Mark, Alan 11 Stoney Beach Road Oshkosh, WI 54902 / US | 02 /
CHIU, Kai, F. 4229 95th Avenue Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | 03 /
LINDSAY, Jeffrey, D. 20 Diane Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/31] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02784144.4 | 17.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002US33225 | Priority number, date | US20010015838 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 15838 | US20010015858 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 15858 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03040450 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1440195 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440195 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/00 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
D21F1/0027 (EP);
D21F1/0036 (EP);
D21F11/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/35] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | GEWEBE ZUR ANWENDUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON TISSUE PRODUKTEN MIT VON EINEM DEKORATIVEN ELEMENT BEGRENZTEN VISUELL UNTERSCHEIDBAREN HINTERGRUNDTEXTURBEREICHEN | [2004/31] | English: | FABRIC FOR USE IN THE MANUFACTURE OF TISSUE PRODUCTS HAVING VISUALLY DISCERNABLE BACKGROUND TEXTURE REGIONS BORDERED BY CURVILINEAR DECORATIVE ELEMENTS | [2004/31] | French: | TOILE POUVANT ETRE UTILISEE POUR LA FABRICATION DE PRODUITS EN PAPIER PRESENTANT DES REGIONS TEXTUREES D'ARRIERE-PLAN VISUELLEMENT EN EVIDENCE BORDEES PAR DES ELEMENTS DECORATIFS CURVILIGNES | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07019184.6 / EP1876291 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.05.2012 | [2012/34] | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19917869 (SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS GMBH) [X] 1,4,6,20,21,30,36,39,40,45,47,62,63,71,73,89 * figures 34,35,44 * [A] 2,37; | [A]WO9732081 (ASTEN) [A] 1,3,4,6,20,21,30,36,38-40,44,45,47,62,63,73 * the whole document *; | [A]US4161195 (KHAN) [A] 1,3,4,6,20,21,29,36,44,45,47,62,63,72 * column W *; | [A]WO9966124 (THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE CIE) [A] 2,4,6,20,21,30,37,45,47,62,63 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0012818 (SCAPA) [A] 2,4,6,20,21,30,37,45,47,62,63 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0039393 (KIMBERLY CLARK WORLDWIDE INC.) [A] 36-42,71,74,79 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0677612 (KIMBERLY-CLARK CORP.) [A] 36-42,71,73,79 * the whole document * |