EP1487637 - CONTACT MEDIA FOR EVAPORATIVE COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yaeger, Ronald J. 4201 Tomberra Way Dallas, TX 75220 / US | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAEGER, Ronald, J. 4201 Tomberra Way Dallas, TX 75220 / US | 02 /
HARTMAN, Galen, W. 105 Janice Circle Kemp, TX 75143 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02784444.8 | 13.11.2002 | [2004/52] | WO2002US36312 | Priority number, date | US20010007976 | 13.11.2001 Original published format: US 7976 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041952 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487637 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/14, F24F3/14, B01D47/16 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C03C25/328 (EP,US);
B01D47/16 (EP,US);
B01D53/18 (EP,US);
B01J19/32 (EP,US);
B32B5/14 (EP,US);
F24F5/0035 (EP,US);
F28D5/00 (EP,US);
F28F25/087 (EP,US);
B01J2219/3221 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32217 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32416 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32441 (EP,US);
B01J2219/326 (EP,US);
B01J2219/3327 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTMEDIEN FÜR VERDUNSTUNGSKÜHLER | [2004/52] | English: | CONTACT MEDIA FOR EVAPORATIVE COOLER | [2004/52] | French: | SUPPORT DE CONTACT POUR REFROIDISSEUR EVAPORATIF | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/48] | 26.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | 27.09.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.09.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   27.09.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2005 | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2006 | 30.11.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3262682 (BREDBERG SVEN J H); | [A]US3792841 (MUNTERS C); | [A]US3798057 (POLOVINA W); | [A]US3862280 (POLOVINA WALTER); | [A]US5260117 (MYERS WARREN D [US], et al) | Examination | - VOELKEL A.; JANAS J., "Solubility Parameters of Broad and Narrow Distributed Oxyethylates of Fatty Alcohols", J. CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1993), vol. 645, pages 141 - 151 |