EP1458530 - FLUSH MOUNTED PRESSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blanking Systems, Inc. 1058 Overland Ct. Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OETLINGER, Frank, E. 1433 Fox Lane Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Dr. Münich & Kollegen C/o MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al Dr. Münich & Kollegen c/o MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02784735.9 | 04.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US38815 | Priority number, date | US20010035732 | 26.12.2001 Original published format: US 35732 | US20020160856 | 03.06.2002 Original published format: US 160856 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03057435 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458530 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458530 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/02, B26D7/18, B26F1/44 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
B26D7/1818 (EP,US);
B26D7/025 (EP,US);
Y10T225/371 (EP,US);
Y10T225/379 (EP,US);
Y10T225/386 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSENKBARES PRESSGERÄT | [2004/39] | English: | FLUSH MOUNTED PRESSER ASSEMBLY | [2004/39] | French: | ENSEMBLE PRESSEUR AFFLEURE | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07002656.2 / EP1785241 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | SI | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | ES | 29.10.2007 | IE | 04.12.2007 | LU | 04.12.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 04.12.2007 | ||
LU | 04.12.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 04.12.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 04.12.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 04.12.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 04.12.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 29.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE419900 (AUGUST SCHIEFERSTEIN) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH393061 (J C MUELLER AG [CH]); | [X]US5766123 (OETLINGER FRANK E [US]) [X] 1-6,23-27 * the whole document * |