EP1444100 - MACHINE FLUID SUPPLY ASSEMBLY COMPRISING KEYING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2010/17] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Gemplus La Vigie - Service Brevets, BP 90 13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATISTA, Jean-Marc 1, allée de bel ombre F-13320 Bouc Bel Air / FR | 02 /
SARRA-BOURNET, Philippe 1570 RN7 Celony F-13190 Aix En Provence / FR | [2004/33] | Application number, filing date | 02785586.5 | 06.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002FR03788 | Priority number, date | FR20010014308 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114308 | [2004/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03039877 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1444100 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1444100 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
B41J2/1755 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSVERSORGUNGSANORDNUNG IN EINER MASCHINE MIT VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSMITTELN | [2004/33] | English: | MACHINE FLUID SUPPLY ASSEMBLY COMPRISING KEYING MEANS | [2004/33] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ALIMENTATION EN FLUIDE D'UNE MACHINE COMPORTANT DES MOYENS DE DETROMPAGE | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | LU | 06.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
LU | 06.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
LU | 06.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 15.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3184782 (ARMOUR DONALD F) [X] 1-10,13,18,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US4708370 (TODD HARRY V [US]) [X] 1-10,13,18,20 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 6; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0523915 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,3-10,13,17,18,20 * column 3, line 3 - line 52; figures 4,5A-5F *; | [A]EP0722837 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [DX]US6164768 (MURPHY STEPHEN W [US], et al) [DX] 1,3-10,13,17,18,20 * abstract *; | [A]WO0135015 (TOSTO WALTER SERBATOI SPA [IT], et al); | [X]WO0180967 (CUNO INC [US]) [X] 1-10,13,18,20 * page 8, line 19 - page 11, line 26 * | by applicant | EP0808416 | US5920333 | US6164768 |