EP1486536 - FLAME-RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Change - representative | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | 07.09.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 18-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8280 / JP | [2007/12] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd 18-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8280 / JP | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd 3-2-5- Kasumigaseki, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6006 / JP | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Polyplastics Co Ltd 3-2-5- Kasumigaseki, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6006 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARASHINA, Hatsuhiko, @Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973,Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8533 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Shinya, @Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8533 / JP | [2012/41] |
Former [2004/51] | 01 /
HARASHINA, Hatsuhiko, Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973,Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8533 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMADA, Shinya, Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-8533 / JP | Representative(s) | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2012/41] |
Former [2007/12] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Mays, Julie Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02785952.9 | 28.11.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002JP12406 | Priority number, date | JP20010368004 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001368004 | [2004/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03046085 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486536 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486536 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1486536 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L67/02, C08K5/521, C08K5/523, C08K5/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/34 (EP,US);
C08K5/51 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (EP,US);
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L71/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L81/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2004/51] | C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | FLAMMWIDRIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/51] | English: | FLAME-RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION | [2004/51] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE IGNIFUGE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | Translation filed | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE Sabic Innovative Plastics B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Grever, Frederik SABIC Innovative Platics B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE Sabic Innovative Plastics B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Grever, Frederik SABIC Innovative Platics B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | 30.11.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.05.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.02.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.08.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | CZ | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | EE | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | FR | 24.01.2007 | IT | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | SK | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | BG | 25.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.05.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | GB | 28.11.2007 | IE | 28.11.2007 | LU | 28.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
LU | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
FR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
FR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
FR | 14.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0791634 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1* claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPS6047056 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]JPH06504563 ; | [A]JPH09111059 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [A]JPH10195283 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH11152402 (DU PONT) |