EP1462455 - Ser-Ser-Ser-Arg peptide and medicinal uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | NOVEL PEPTIDES AND MEDICINAL USES THEREOF | ||
[2012/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 533-8651 / JP | For all designated states Nishida, Teruo 8-4, Asutopia 6-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0152 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 533-8651 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nishida, Teruo 8-4, Asutopia 6-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0152 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDA, Teruo 8-4, Asutopia 6-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0152 / JP | 02 /
INUI, Makoto 6-25-1001, Unoshimacho Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0062 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, M. Santen Pharm. Co. Ltd. Kenkyusho 8916-16, Takayama-cho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
NISHIDA, Teruo 8-4, Asutopia 6-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0152 / JP | ||
02 /
INUI, Makoto 6-25-1001, Unoshimacho Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0062 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, M., c/o Santen Pharm. Co. Ltd. Kenkyusho 8916-16, Takayama-cho Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02786015.4 | 03.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002JP12632 | Priority number, date | JP20010368103 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001368103 | [2004/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048192 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462455 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462455 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/10, C07K7/06, A61K38/30, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K9/70, A61P27/02, A61P17/02, C07K14/65, A61K9/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
A61K38/30 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (KR);
A61K38/07 (KR);
A61K9/0048 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP,KR);
C07K14/65 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | C07K5/10, C07K7/06, A61K38/30, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K9/70, A61P27/02, A61P17/02, C07K14/65 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Ser-Ser-Ser-Arg Peptid und medizinische Verwendungen davon | [2012/46] | English: | Ser-Ser-Ser-Arg peptide and medicinal uses thereof | [2012/46] | French: | Peptide Ser-Ser-Ser-Arg et son utilisation en tant que médicament | [2012/46] |
Former [2004/40] | NEUE PEPTIDE UND DEREN MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2004/40] | NOVEL PEPTIDES AND MEDICINAL USES THEREOF | ||
Former [2004/40] | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS EN TANT QUE MEDICAMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | Translation filed | 25.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 25.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10000425.8 / EP2172474 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9308826 (CEPHALON INC [US]) [X] 1 * sequences 63, 65, 66 *; | [X]WO9323067 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 11 *; | [X]EP0914827 (SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048]; claims 1-6; table 3 *; | [X]US6310040 (BOZYCZKO-COYNE DONNA [US], et al) [X] 1 * sequences 3,4,7,10-12 *; | [E]EP1308165 (SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 6-8,12-14* examples 1-3; claims 1,4,5,9,10 *; | [X] - MASATSUGU NAKAMURA, TAI-ICHIRO CHIKAMA, TERUO NISHIDA, "Synergistic effect with Phe-Gly-Leu-Met-NH2 of the C-terminal of substance P and insulin-like growth factor-1 on epithelial wound healing of rabbit cornea", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (199905), vol. 127, no. 2, pages 489 - 497, XP002504947 [X] 1-5,9-11 * figures 2,3,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0702550 | [X] - TAI-ICHIRO CHIKAMA ET AL., "Treatment of neurotrophic keratopathy with substance-P-derived peptide (FGLM) and insulin-like growth factor I", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (19980613), vol. 351, no. 9118, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1783 - 1788, XP004265387 [X] 1-3,5,9,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(98)24024-4 | [X] - MALORNI A ET AL, "Effect of matrix modification by strong mineral acids on the positive fast atom bombardment mass spectra of peptides", BIOMEDICAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL MASS SPECTROMETRY, WILEY, LONDON, (19860901), vol. 13, no. 9, ISSN 0887-6134, pages 477 - 482, XP008088584 [X] 1 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bms.1200130905 | International search | [X]WO9308826 (CEPHALON INC [US]); | [X]WO9323067 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al); | [Y]WO9749419 (SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) |