EP1457555 - METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING GIBBERELLIN RESPONSIVE GENES USING CULTURED PLANT CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF AGROBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES 1-2 Kannondai 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states National Institute of Agrobiological Sciences 1-2 Kannondai 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAMI, Eiichi, c/o Nat.Inst.Agrobiol.Sciences 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | 02 /
SHIBUYA, Naoto, Nat. Inst. of Agrobio. Sciences 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki305-8602 / JP | 03 /
DAY, Robert, B., Nat. Inst. of Agrobio. Sciences 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02786175.6 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002JP13376 | Priority number, date | JP20010388993 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001388993 | [2004/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03054192 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457555 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N5/04, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SI [2004/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON AUF GIBBERELLIN REAGIERENDEN GENEN UNTER VERWENDUNG KULTIVIERTER PFLANZENZELLEN | [2004/38] | English: | METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING GIBBERELLIN RESPONSIVE GENES USING CULTURED PLANT CELLS | [2004/38] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE GENES SENSIBLES A LA GIBBERELLINE A L'AIDE DE CELLULES VEGETALES CULTIVEES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2004 | Translation filed | 17.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SHI L ET AL, "Gibberellin and abscisic acid regulate GAST1 expression at the level of transcription", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (199812), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 1053 - 1060, XP002327476 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006007315718 | International search | [X] - VAN DER KNAAP E. ET AL., "Transcript level for a gene encoding a putative type la plasma membrane receptor is induced by gibberellin in deepwater rice", PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 39, no. 11, pages 1127 - 1132, XP002965854 | [X] - WASHIO K. ET AL., "Identification of dof proteins with implication in the gibberellin-regulated expression of a peptidase gene following the germination of rice grains", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (200107), vol. 1520, no. 1, pages 54 - 62, XP004255722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4781(01)00251-2 | [X] - VISHNEVETSKY M. ET AL., "CHRC, encoding a chromoplast-specific carotenoid-associated protein, is an early gibberellic acid-responsive gene", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 40, pages 24747 - 24750, XP002965852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.40.24747 | [X] - CHONO M. ET AL., "cDNA cloning and characterization of a gibberellin-responsive gene in hypocotyls of cucumis sativus L.", PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 686 - 691, XP002965853 | [X] - OGAWA M. ET AL., "Gibberellin-responsive genes: high level of transcript accumulation in leaf sheath meristematic tissue from zea mays L.", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 645 - 657, XP002182552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006291917591 | [A] - DAY ROBERT B. ET AL., "Large-scale identification of elicitor-responsive genes in suspension-cultured rice cells by DNA microarray", PLANT BIOTECHNOL., (200206), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 153 - 155, XP002965855 |