EP1516502 - A METHOD FOR EMBEDDING A RADIO FREQUENCY ANTENNA IN A TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2007/38] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMSON, John, David 101 Red Oak Court Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 02 /
KELLY, Charles, Edward 209 River Walk Court Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 03 /
O'BRIEN, George, Phillips 142 Wren School Road Piedmont, SC 29673 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Dequire, Philippe Jean-Marie Denis Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Dequire, Philippe M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02786837.1 | 03.12.2002 | [2005/12] | WO2002US38411 | Priority number, date | WO2002US18411 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: PCT/US02/18411 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105511 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516502 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516502 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2241 (EP);
B60C23/0433 (EP);
B60C23/0493 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/12] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINBETTEN EINER HOCHFREQUENZANTENNE IN EINEN REIFEN | [2005/12] | English: | A METHOD FOR EMBEDDING A RADIO FREQUENCY ANTENNA IN A TIRE | [2005/12] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'INCORPORER UNE ANTENNE RADIOFREQUENCE DANS UN PNEUMATIQUE | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2007 | BE | 19.09.2007 | CH | 19.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2007 | CZ | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | EE | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | LI | 19.09.2007 | NL | 19.09.2007 | SI | 19.09.2007 | SK | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | IE | 03.12.2007 | LU | 03.12.2007 | BG | 19.12.2007 | GB | 19.12.2007 | SE | 19.12.2007 | DE | 20.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | ES | 30.12.2007 | IT | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | PT | 19.02.2008 | FR | 23.05.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/42] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
TR | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
LU | 03.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
LU | 03.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
DE | 20.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 19.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1049196 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0031] ** figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US5541574 (LOWE PETER R [US], et al); | [A]US6062072 (MOCK MARKUS [CH], et al); | [A]US6147659 (TAKAHASHI OSAMU [JP], et al) |