EP1441689 - SOLID ORAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perfetti Van Melle S.p.A. Via XXV Aprile, 7/9 20020 Lainate (Milan) / IT | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLE, Roberto Via XXV Aprile, 7/9 I-20020 Lainate / IT | 02 /
SALMOIRAGHI, Guglielmo Via XXV Aprile, 7/9 I-20020 Lainate / IT | 03 /
BARRICA, Andrea Via XXV Aprile, 7/9 I-20020 Lainate / IT | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr., et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02787567.3 | 05.11.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002EP12330 | Priority number, date | IT2001MI00232 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: IT MI20010232 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03039504 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441689 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441689 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/21, A61K8/24, A61K8/27, A61K8/43, A61K8/97, A61K8/11, A61Q11/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A23G3/362 (EP,US);
A23G3/368 (EP,US);
A23G3/48 (EP,US);
A23G4/06 (EP,US);
A23G4/064 (EP,US);
A23G4/068 (EP,US);
A23G4/126 (EP,US);
A61K8/21 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/32] | A61K7/16, A61K7/18, A61K7/22, A61K7/26, A23G3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/32] | English: | SOLID ORAL COMPOSITIONS | [2004/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ORALES SOLIDES | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 13.07.2006 | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/42] | TR | 12.04.2006 | |
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | GR | 13.07.2006 | |
Former [2007/50] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/39] | IT | 12.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5000944 (PRENCIPE MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 8 - line 28 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 10 * * column 5, line 35 - line 63 * * column 6, line 39 - line 54 ** column 7, line 4 - line 34 *; | [XY]US5958380 (WINSTON ANTHONY E [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * column 3, line 46 - line 67 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 39 - line 67 * * column 7, line 9 - line 34 * * column 8, line 53 - line 60 * * column 10, line 4 - line 55 * * column 13, line 24 - line 38 * [Y] 1,4-7,9,10; | [Y]WO0030465 (DANDY A S [DK], et al) [Y] 1,4-7,9,10 * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 3, line 20 - line 28 * * page 8, line 21 - line 24 * * page 11, line 20 - line 22 * * page 13, line 36 - page 14, line 17 *; | [X]WO0117494 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * page 3, line 28 - line 32 * * page 4, line 21 - line 28 * * page 8, line 4 - line 35 * * page 9, line 10 - line 30 * * page 11, line 1 - line 8 *; | [Y]WO0156399 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph L * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph L * | Examination | - PDR for Herbicidal Medicines | - GERALD KOWITZ ET AL, "The effects of tartar-control toothpaste on the oral soft tissues", ORAL SURG ORAL MED ORAL PATHOL, (1990), pages 529 - 536 | - DELATTRE V.F., "Factors contributing to adverse soft tissue reactions due to the use of tartar control toothpastes", PERIODONTOL, (1999), pages 803 - 807 |