EP1447851 - SEMICONDUCTOR STORAGE DEVICE, ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD AND OPERATING METHOD, AND PORTABLE ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATA, Hiroshi 2-4-13, Sangocho, Shigigaoka Ikoma-gun, Nara 636-0813 / JP | 02 /
SHIBATA, Akihide 104-B203, Misasagicho Nara-shi, Nara 631-0803 / JP | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02788619.1 | 18.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002JP12028 | Priority number, date | JP20010356549 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001356549 | [2004/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03044868 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447851 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/788, H01L29/792, H01L27/115, H01L21/8247, H01L29/423, H01L21/28 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
H01L29/66833 (EP,KR,US);
G11C16/0466 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/84 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/118 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/1203 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/792 (EP,KR,US);
H10B43/30 (EP,KR,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | H01L29/788, H01L29/792, H01L27/115, H01L21/8247 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSPEICHEREINRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND ZU IHREM BETRIEB UND TRAGBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2004/34] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR STORAGE DEVICE, ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD AND OPERATING METHOD, AND PORTABLE ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2004/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ET APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE PORTATIF | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2004 | Translation filed | 18.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.03.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 26.04.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 15.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2017 | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/23] | 29.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 15.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5703388 (WANG CHIH-HSIEN [TW], et al); | [X]JP2001237330 (SONY CORP) | International search | [X]JPS63204770 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08191110 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]US5838041 (SAKAGAMI EIJI [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH11274331 (NEC CORP); | [X]JP2001237330 (SONY CORP) | Examination | JP2001156188 |