EP1438374 - COMPONENTS FOR BLENDING OF TRANSPORTATION FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 4101 Winfield Road, Mail Code 5 East Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODGES, Michael Knowsleigh, Barnet Lane Wonersh, Surrey GU5 05A / GB | 02 /
KETLEY, Graham 11 The Old Orchard, Wrecclesham Franham, Surrey GU9 8UR / GB | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
HODGES, Michael Knowsleigh, Barnet Lane Wonersh, Surrey GU5 05A / GB | ||
02 /
KETLEY, Graham 963 Creekside Circle Naperville, IL 60563 / US | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire, et al The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Mathys & Squire LLP, et al 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Andrieux, Benoît, et al IFP Energies nouvelles 1 et 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/30] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02789268.6 | 24.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002US34072 | Priority number, date | US20010334769P | 25.10.2001 Original published format: US 334769 P | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03035808 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1438374 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/16 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
C10L1/04 (EP,US);
C10L1/06 (EP,US);
C10L1/08 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/1616 (EP,US);
C10L10/00 (EP,US);
C10L1/1973 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTANDTEILE ZUR VERMISCHUNG VON TRANSPORTKRAFTSTOFFEN | [2004/30] | English: | COMPONENTS FOR BLENDING OF TRANSPORTATION FUELS | [2004/30] | French: | COMPOSANTS UTILISES COMME ADDITIFS DE CARBURANTS DE TRANSPORT | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/15] | 10.08.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.12.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/15] | Appeal following examination | 08.10.2010 | Appeal received No. T0282/11 | 10.12.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.06.2012 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M08) [2012/26] | 13.12.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 13.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.01.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9617810 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-8,13-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US5599441 (COLLINS NICK A [US], et al) [A] 1-8,13-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9830655 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-8,13-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9909117 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0014182 (BP AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-8,13-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0078897 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,9-12* the whole document * |