EP1450914 - BOOK BASED GAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTEL, INC. 333 Continental Boulevard El Segundo, California 90254 / US | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEDFORD, Jonathan 5531 Wiseburn Hawthorne, CA 90250 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerald Christian, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Müller, Gerald Christian, et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02789386.6 | 01.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US35181 | Priority number, date | US20010340007P | 01.11.2001 Original published format: US 340007 P | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03037461 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450914 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/00, A63F3/02 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
A63F3/0023 (EP,US);
A63F3/00 (KR);
A63F3/00006 (EP,US);
A63F3/00145 (EP,US);
A63F3/04 (EP,US);
G09B1/02 (EP,US);
A63F1/04 (EP,US);
A63F1/10 (EP,US);
A63F11/0011 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00009 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00022 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00135 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00217 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00223 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00299 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00394 (EP,US);
A63F2003/0047 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00618 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00848 (EP,US);
A63F2003/0094 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00943 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00962 (EP,US);
A63F2009/0036 (EP,US);
A63F2011/0018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | A63F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELE AUF BUCHGRUNDLAGE | [2004/36] | English: | BOOK BASED GAMES | [2004/36] | French: | JEUX BASES SUR DES LIVRES | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR994883 (M. ANDRE-EUGENE MORIZE) [X] 1,6,8,11* figure - *; | [X]US6203017 (SCHULTZ LUCY K [US]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * column 3, line 9 - line 19 * * column 5, line 3 - line 37 * * figure - * | International search | [Y]US1699132 (BUCHANAN DONALD I); | [Y]US3206887 (EYLER JOHN F, et al); | [Y]US3553851 (PAIGE RICHARD E); | [Y]US6203017 (SCHULTZ LUCY K [US]) |