EP1458274 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIERMANN, Rüdiger Zwergbachstr. 7 89428 Sygenstein / DE | [2004/39] | Application number, filing date | 02790376.4 | 14.11.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002EP12779 | Priority number, date | DE2001162506 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162506 | [2004/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051171 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458274 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/16, A47L15/50 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A47L15/505 (EP,US);
A47L15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE | [2004/39] | English: | DISHWASHER | [2004/39] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2075488 (COLGED SNC) [X] 1-4,6,11-14,16 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1233812 (ANTONIO ZANUSSI) [X] 1-4,6-14,16-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US3463173 (GOLDMAN DAVID) [X] 1-5,7,11-15,17 * column W *; | [X]FR2544606 (LANCER IND SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,11-15,17 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB1138291 (EDWARD GELLES, et al) [X] 11-13,15,17 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6,7,16 |