EP1435032 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING AND VERIFYING CONTENT OF MULTIMEDIA DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSAFI, Hassane 97, rue de Paris, Résidence de l'Yvette (Bât. B1) F-91400 Orsay / FR | 02 /
PIC, Marc 56, rue de Cantagrel F-75013 Paris / FR | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2004/28] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02790507.4 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002FR03471 | Priority number, date | FR20010013224 | 12.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0113224 | [2004/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032136 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435032 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
G06F21/645 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN UND VERIFIZIEREN VON INHALT VON MULTIMEDIADOKUMENTEN | [2004/28] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING AND VERIFYING CONTENT OF MULTIMEDIA DOCUMENTS | [2004/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE VERIFICATION DU CONTENU DE DOCUMENTS MULTIMEDIA | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0380240 (IBM) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - line 39 * * page 3, line 32 - line 51 * * page 4, line 10 - line 20 * * page 5, line 37 - line 44 * * page 8, line 13 - line 28 * * claims 1-4,7,8 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0936531 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,5,6,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0012] , [0016] - [0024] * * claims 1,3,5-7 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]JP2001100743 ; | [A]JP2000330873 ; | [A]GB2339038 (IBM) [A] 7-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5870754 (DIMITROVA NEVENKA ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 31 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 9 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 17 * * column 8, line 15 - line 29 * * column 19, line 16 - line 29 * * column 19, line 46 - line 58 * * column 20, line 54 - line 65 * * figure 2 * | [Y] - ZHAO J, "a www service to embed and prove digital copyright watermarks", FRAUNHOFER INSTITUTE FOR COMPUTER GRPHICS, XP000199921 [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0005] * * figures 2,5,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001100743 A 20010413 (WIIFOONYUU CO LTD) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000330873 A 20001130 (M KEN:KK) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * |