EP1463849 - BORON DOPED DIAMOND AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/41] | BORON DOPED DIAMOND | ||
[2006/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Six Limited Isle of Man Freeport, Ballasalla Isle of Man IM99 6AQ / GB | [2007/05] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Element Six Limited Isle of Man Freeport, Ballasalla Isle of Man IM99 6AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCARSBROOK, Geoffrey Alan 40 Cavendish Mead, Sunninghill Ascot, Berkshire SL5 9TD / GB | 02 /
MARTINEAU, Philip Maurice Littlewick End, Coronation Road Littlewick Green, Berkshire SL6 3RA / GB | 03 /
TWITCHEN, Daniel James 10 Park Drive Sunningdale, Berkshire SL5 0BD / GB | 04 /
WHITEHEAD, Andrew John 60 Cheylesmore Drive, Frimley Camberley, Surrey GU16 9BW / GB | 05 /
COOPER, Michael Andrew 28 Clifton Road Wokingham, Berkshire / GB | 06 /
DORN, Bärbel Susanne Charlotte 11 Slaidburn Green, Forest Park Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 0WG / GB | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02790571.0 | 13.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002IB05324 | Priority number, date | GB20010030005 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0130005 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03052174 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1463849 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463849 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/04 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
C30B25/105 (EP,US);
C30B25/10 (KR);
C30B29/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | C30B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BORDOTIERTE DIAMANT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/22] | English: | BORON DOPED DIAMOND AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [2006/22] | French: | DIAMANT DOPE AU BORE ET PROCEDE POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2006/22] |
Former [2004/41] | BORDOTIERTE DIAMANT | ||
Former [2004/41] | BORON DOPED DIAMOND | ||
Former [2004/41] | DIAMANT DOPE AU BORE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06076850.4 / EP1780315 | Opposition(s) | 01.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2007 | CY | 31.01.2007 | DK | 31.01.2007 | EE | 31.01.2007 | FI | 31.01.2007 | SI | 31.01.2007 | SK | 31.01.2007 | BG | 01.05.2007 | GR | 01.05.2007 | PT | 02.07.2007 | [2023/26] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
CY | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
CY | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
EE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SK | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
SI | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 01.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 31.01.2007 | |
BG | 01.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0348026 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]); | [X]EP0386726 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 36,45,46 * example 5 *; | [X]EP0386727 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 36,45,46 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0573943 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-48 * column 8, line 16 - line 43; claims 1,38,39 *; | [A]NL9201987 (STICHTING KATHOLIEKE UNIV) [A] 1-48 * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 2; claims 1-21 *; | [A]US5381755 (GLESENER JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US5635258 (CHEN CHIA-FU [TW], et al); | [A]EP0879904 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X] - LAGRANGE J-P ET AL, "ACTIVATION ENERGY IN LOW COMPENSATED HOMOEPITAXIAL BORON-DOPED DIAMOND FILMS", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980901), vol. 7, no. 8, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 1390 - 1393, XP000667693 [X] 36,45,46 * page 1391 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(98)00225-8 | [X] - FUJIMORI ET AL., "Characterization of conducting diamond films", VACUUM, (1986), vol. 36, no. 1-3, pages 99 - 102, XP002241037 [X] 36,45,46 * page 99 - page 100, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-207X(86)90279-4 | [X] - HAUG C ET AL, "Characterisation and lattice location of nitrogen and boron in homoepitaxial CVD diamond", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960701), vol. 5, no. 9, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 947 - 951, XP004080600 [X] 36,38-41,45 * page 948 - page 950 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-9635(95)00471-8 | [X] - HIROMU SHIOMI ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF BORON-DOPED DIAMOND EPITAXIAL FILMS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (19910701), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 1363 - 1366, XP000329416 [X] 36,44-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.30.1363 |