EP1575874 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING HYDROTALCITE AND BRUCITE TYPE POSITE CHARGED LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2010/36] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZA, Pravinchandra Mahasukhray Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 02 /
MEHTA, Satishbhai Hariray Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 03 /
SHETH, Murnalben Vinodray Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 04 /
GHOSH, Pushpito Kumar Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 05 /
GANDHI, Mahesh Ramniklal Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 06 /
CHUNAWALA, Jatin Rameshchandra Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | [2010/10] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
OZA, Pravinchandra Mahasukhray Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | ||
02 /
MEHTA, Satishbhai Hariray Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | |||
03 /
SHETH, Murnalben Vinodra Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | |||
04 /
GHOSH, Pushpito Kumar Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | |||
05 /
GANDHI, Mahesh Ramniklal Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | |||
06 /
CHUNAWALA, Jatin Rameshchandra Central Salt & Marine Chemicals Research Institute Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02790655.1 | 23.12.2002 | [2005/38] | WO2002IB05722 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056705 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575874 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575874 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/00, C09C1/40 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C09C1/40 (EP,US);
C01F7/785 (EP,US);
C01P2002/22 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2002/82 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | 28.06.2005 | LT | 28.06.2005 | LV | 28.06.2005 | MK | 28.06.2005 | RO | 28.06.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROTALCIT | [2005/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING HYDROTALCITE AND BRUCITE TYPE POSITE CHARGED LAYERS | [2005/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COUCHES CHARGEES POSITIVEMENT DE TYPE HYDROTALCITE ET BRUCITE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | IE | 23.12.2010 | LU | 23.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.12.2010 | ||
LU | 23.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.12.2010 | ||
LU | 23.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6163526 ; | [DA]CS277548 ; | [A]US2257544 (CLARKE ROBERT E) [A] 1,21 * page 1, column R, line 6 - line 22; claim - *; | [DA]WO9322237 (HUBER CORP J M [US]); | [A]US2002006375 (OKADA AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]WO02079090 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al); | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860807), vol. 010, no. 226, Database accession no. (C - 364), & JP61063526 A 19860401 (TOKUYAMA SODA CO LTD) [A] 1,21 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 22, Database accession no. 1993-176262, XP002260918 & CS277548 B6 19930217 (USTAV ANORGANICKEJ CHEM SAV) [DA] * abstract * |