EP1457531 - ANTIFOULING PAINT COMPOSITION, ANTIFOULING PAINT FILMS, AND SHIPS, UNDERWATER STRUCTURES, FISHING GEAR AND FISHING NETS COVERED WITH THE FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKIMOTO, Hiroyuki, CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 02 /
MUKUNOKI, Yasuo, CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 03 /
ASHIDA, Toshihiko, CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 04 /
ONO, Masashi, CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02790807.8 | 18.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002JP13244 | Priority number, date | JP20020308820 | 23.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002308820 | [2004/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004037932 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457531 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457531 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, C09D7/12, C09D133/02, C09D201/00, A01K75/00, E02B1/00, // B63B59/04 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C09D5/1668 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (KR);
A01K75/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/16 (KR);
C09D5/1625 (EP,US);
C09D5/165 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | C09D5/16, C09D7/12, C09D133/02, C09D201/00, A01K75/00, E02B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/41] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTIFOULINGBESCHICHTUNGSSTOFF UND DAMIT BESCHICHTETE SCHIFFE, UNTERWASSERKONSTRUKTIONEN, FISCHEREIGERÄT UND FISCHERNETZE | [2004/38] | English: | ANTIFOULING PAINT COMPOSITION, ANTIFOULING PAINT FILMS, AND SHIPS, UNDERWATER STRUCTURES, FISHING GEAR AND FISHING NETS COVERED WITH THE FILMS | [2004/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PEINTURE ANTIFOULING, FILMS DE PEINTURE ANTIFOULING, ET NAVIRES, STRUCTURES SOUS MARINES, MATERIEL DE PECHE ET FILETS DE PECHE RECOUVERTS PAR CES FILMS | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | Translation filed | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | IE | 18.12.2010 | LU | 18.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
LU | 18.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | SE | 13.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001323208 ; | [A]GB2255343 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-6,25,26,28 * claims 1,14 *; | [A]WO9532862 (US HEALTH [US]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,5-8 *; | WO9853015 [ ] (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1006156 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * claims 1-5 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 31, Database accession no. 2002-262475, XP002444763 & JP2001323208 A 20011122 (CHUGOKU TORYO KK) [X] 1-26,28 * abstract * [Y] 1-29 | International search | [Y]JPH06340504 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL); | [Y]WO9853015 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1167398 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [Y]JP2002069360 (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS) |