EP1577380 - METHOD OF CULTURING MULTIPOTENT STEM CELLS AND CULTURE APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/38] | METHOD OF CULTURING PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS AND CULTURE APPARATUS THEREFOR | ||
[2012/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | For all designated states Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakurakuen 6-chome Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5136 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | ||
For all designated states Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakurakuen 6-chome Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5136 / US | |||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | ||
For all designated states Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakurakuen 6-chome Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5136 / US | |||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | ||
For all designated states Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakurakuen 6-chome Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5136 / US | |||
For all designated states Uemura, Masaru 1-1 Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-0854 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakurakuen 6-chome Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5136 / JP | 02 /
Uemura, Masaru, @Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1-1 Wadasaki-cho Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0854 / JP | [2013/02] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakuraku-en 6-chome Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5136 / JP | ||
02 /
Uemura, Masaru, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1-1 Wadasaki-cho, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0854 / JP | |||
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
Yuge, Rui 303, 12-23 Rakuraku-en 6-chome Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5136 / JP | ||
02 /
Uemura, Masaru, KOBE Shipyard & Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd., 1-1-1 Wadasaki-cho Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0854 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02790926.6 | 27.12.2002 | [2005/38] | WO2002JP13774 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061092 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577380 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577380 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C12N5/0775, C12M3/00 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
C12N5/0663 (EP,US);
C12M35/04 (EP,US);
C12N2525/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | C12N5/08, C12M3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON MULTIPOTENTEN STAMMZELLEN UND KULTURVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2013/02] | English: | METHOD OF CULTURING MULTIPOTENT STEM CELLS AND CULTURE APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2013/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES MULTIPOTENTES ET APPAREIL DE CULTURE ASSOCIÉ | [2013/02] |
Former [2005/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON PLURIPOTENTEN STAMMZELLEN UND KULTURVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | ||
Former [2005/38] | METHOD OF CULTURING PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS AND CULTURE APPARATUS THEREFOR | ||
Former [2005/38] | PROCEDE DE CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES ET APPAREIL DE CULTURE ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2005 | Translation filed | 27.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1249519 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [E]US2003041800 (UEMURA MASARU [JP], et al) [E] 1-27* the whole document *; | [A] - BECKER J L ET AL, "Three-dimensional growth and differentiation of ovarian tumor cell line in high aspect rotating-wall vessel: morphologic and embryologic considerations.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY. MAR 1993, (199303), vol. 51, no. 3, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 283 - 289, XP002372126 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcb.240510307 | International search | [X]WO9533821 (ADVANCED TISSUE SCIENCES INC [US]); | [X]JP2002045173 (II C T KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH0789798B | EP1249519 | JP2002045173 |