EP1452061 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATION OF SUBSTREAMS IN CIRCUIT SWITCHED CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATION OF SUBSTREAMS IN CIRCUIT SWITHCHED CONNECTIONS | ||
[2008/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LJUND, Stefan Krukmakarbacken S-186 97 BROTTBY / SE | 02 /
EDLUND, Peter Kassmyravägen 18 S-147 33 TUMBA / SE | 03 /
LUND, Lars-Göran Svedjevägen 28 S-167 54 BROMMA / SE | 04 /
COLBAN, Erik 3968 Del Mar Glen San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
EDHOLM, Christer Atlasgatan 3 S-113 20 Stockholm / SE | 06 /
BREDIN, Patrik Ängsvägen 72 A S-Huddinge 141 41 / SE | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN Implementation & Core (PU-KRIC) Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB, Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02791136.1 | 22.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002SE02146 | Priority number, date | US20010994332 | 26.11.2001 Original published format: US 994332 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03047300 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452061 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H04W72/542 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04W48/06 (EP,US);
H04W74/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON TEILSTRÖMEN IN LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2008/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATION OF SUBSTREAMS IN CIRCUIT SWITCHED CONNECTIONS | [2008/27] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AFFECTATION DE SOUS-FLUX DANS DES CONNEXIONS EN MODE CIRCUIT | [2008/27] |
Former [2004/36] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON TEILSTROMEN IN LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2004/36] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATION OF SUBSTREAMS IN CIRCUIT SWITHCHED CONNECTIONS | ||
Former [2004/36] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AFFECTATION DE SOUS-COURANTS DE CONNEXIONS EN MODE CIRCUIT | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9723110 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 23-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9943172 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 7,8,18,19* page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 34 *; | [XA]US6148209 (HAEMAELAEINEN JARI [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,11-16,22-30 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 18 - line 59 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 19 * * column 10, line 7 - column 11, line 9 * * abstract * [A] 7-9,18-20 | by applicant | WO9723110 | US6148209 |