EP1457002 - PERSISTENT STORAGE OF NETWORK MANAGEMENT DATA USING OBJECT REFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMMHUBER, Wolfgang Oberhuberstr. 8 81827 München / DE | [2004/38] | Application number, filing date | 02791640.2 | 17.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002DE04618 | Priority number, date | DE2001163533 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10163533 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03056757 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457002 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457002 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04Q3/00, G06F17/30 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/21] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSISTENTE SPEICHERUNG VON NETZWERKMANAGEMENTDATEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON OBJEKTREFERENZEN | [2004/38] | English: | PERSISTENT STORAGE OF NETWORK MANAGEMENT DATA USING OBJECT REFERENCES | [2004/38] | French: | STOCKAGE PERSISTANT DE DONNEES DE GESTION DE RESEAU A L'AIDE DE REFERENCES D'OBJETS | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 22.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.05.2006 | IT | 24.05.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 24.05.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 04.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5414812 (FILIP MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14-18 * column 8, line 26 - column 22, line 4; figures 4-8 * [Y] 11-13; | [XY]EP0977400 (BULL SA [FR]) [X] 1-10,14-18 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0066] * [Y] 11-13; | [XY]GB2344963 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-10,14-18 * page 6, line 19 - page 11, line 20 * [Y] 11-13; | [Y] - GONCALVES P R R ET AL, "Telecommunications services management with computational reflection, using CORBA and JAVA", TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYMPOSIUM, 1998. ITS '98 PROCEEDINGS. SBT/IEEE INTERNATIONAL SAO PAULO, BRAZIL 9-13 AUG. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980809), ISBN 0-7803-5030-8, pages 486 - 491, XP010300833 [Y] 11-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITS.1998.718442 | [A] - WEINSTOCK J ET AL, "An object-oriented approach to the management of distributed application systems", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19971215), vol. 29, no. 16, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1869 - 1879, XP004107249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(97)00092-5 |