EP1456309 - COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNICHEMA CHEMIE B.V. Buurtje 1 2802 AA Gouda / NL | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APPELMAN, Eric Adriaan van Bleijenburgstraat 22 NL-3311 LB Dordrecht / NL | 02 /
HONCOOP, Wilhelmus, Jacobus, Adrianus Wilgenstr 10 NL-2861 TP Bergambacht / NL | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Humphries, Martyn, et al Uniqema Limited Intellectual Property Department Wilton Centre Wilton Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | [2009/26] |
Former [2004/38] | Humphries, Martyn, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Dept., Wilton Centre, Wilton Redcar TS10 4RF / GB | Application number, filing date | 02791858.0 | 19.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002EP14561 | Priority number, date | GB20010030659 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0130659 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03054092 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456309 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456309 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C08G59/50 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C08G59/5013 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L63/00 (KR);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31515 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31522 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31529 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSMITTEL | [2004/38] | English: | COATING COMPOSITION | [2004/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.11.2005 | SI | 30.11.2005 | SK | 30.11.2005 | CY | 19.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | LU | 30.01.2006 | BG | 28.02.2006 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
SK | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB878132 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-12 * claims 1,5 * * page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 10 ** page 1, lines 9-14 *; | [X]GB949717 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-12 * claims 1,6,18,23,24 * * example VI * * page 4, lines 23-52 * * page 6, lines 19-21 * |