EP1577407 - ALLOYED-MOLTEN-ZINC-PLATED STEEL SHEET WITH EXCELLENT PROCESSABILITY AND HIGH STRENGTH AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDA, Kazuhiko, NIPPON STEEL CORP. KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 02 /
KAMEDA, Masaharu, NIPPON STEEL CORP. KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 03 /
SAKUMA, Yasuharu, NIPPON STEEL CORP. KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 04 /
SAITO, Akio, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 05 /
NISHIYAMA, Tetsuo, NIPPON STEEL CORP KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | 06 /
ITAMI, Atsushi, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
HONDA, Kazuhiko, NIPPON STEEL CORP. KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimisu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMEDA, Masaharu, NIPPON STEEL CORP. KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKUMA, Yasuharu, NIPPON STEEL CORP. KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | |||
04 /
SAITO, Akio, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | |||
05 /
NISHIYAMA, Tetsuo, NIPPON STEEL CORP KIMITSU WORKS 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu-shi, Chiba 299-1141 / JP | |||
06 /
ITAMI, Atsushi, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 02792029.7 | 26.12.2002 | [2005/38] | WO2002JP13712 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061137 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577407 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577407 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C21D8/02, C22C38/04, C23C2/06, C23C2/28 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B32B15/013 (EP,US);
C22C18/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C23C2/06 (EP,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,US);
C23C2/29 (EP,US);
C21D8/0278 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/16] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIT ZINKLEGIERUNGSSCHMELZE ÜBERZOGENES STAHLBLECH MIT SEHR GUTER VERARBEITBARKEIT UND HOHER FESTIGKEIT SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/38] | English: | ALLOYED-MOLTEN-ZINC-PLATED STEEL SHEET WITH EXCELLENT PROCESSABILITY AND HIGH STRENGTH AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/38] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER PLAQUE EN ZINC FONDU ALLIE PRESENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE APTITUDE AU TRAITEMENT ET UNE RESISTANCE ELEVEE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2005 | Translation filed | 24.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1160346 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]WO02055751 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* example -; claim - * | International search | [A]JPH05163561 (KUROSAKI REFRACTORIES CO, et al); | [A]JPH0748662 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH11193419 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPH11279691 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH11323492 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JP2001140022 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |