EP1470820 - CARBON DIOXIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR EXTERNAL USE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neochemir, Inc. 2-20, Goko-dori 4-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0087 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Neochemir Inc. 2-20, Goko-dori 4-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0087 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Masaya 4-20-602, Minamimachi 3-chome, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0036 / JP | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02792071.9 | 27.12.2002 | [2004/44] | WO2002JP13877 | Priority number, date | JP20010400989 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001400989 | [2004/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03057228 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470820 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/44, A61K7/00, A61K7/48, A61K9/08, A61K35/72, A61K35/74, A61K47/32, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61P17/00, A61P17/02, A61P17/10, A61P43/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K33/44 (KR);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/06 (KR);
A61K47/38 (KR);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/99 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHLENDIOXID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ÄUSSEREN ANWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/44] | English: | CARBON DIOXIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR EXTERNAL USE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2004/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE POUR USAGE EXTERNE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2004 | Translation filed | 28.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 28.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57206333 ; | [Y]GB1502893 (ROGER & GALLET [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y]EP1043023 (MEDION RESEARCH LAB INC [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-48 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830308), vol. 007, no. 056, Database accession no. (C - 155), & JP57206333 A 19821217 (MEIJI NIYUUGIYOU KK) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS61293930 (KAO CORP); | [X]JPH0517363 (YAKULT HONSHA KK); | [X]JPH07188037 (ALCON LAB INC); | [X]EP0887070 (KIBUN FOOD CHEMIFA [JP]); | [Y]JP2000239172 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC); | [A]JP2000319187 (MEDION RES LAB INC); | [X]JP2001064174 (TAKEDA FOOD PRODUCTS LTD) |