EP1469738 - CHEESE FLAVOUR INGREDIENT AND METHOD OF ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fonterra Co-Operative Group Limited Building 103 Leonard Isitt Drive, Auckland Airport Auckland / NZ | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Fonterra Co-Operative Group Limited Building 103 Leonard Isitt Drive, Auckland Airport Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROW, Vaughan, Leslie 15 Slacks Road Palmerston North / NZ | 02 /
HAYES, Michelle 196B Ferguson Street Palmerston North / NZ | 03 /
CURRY, Brian, James 103 Ruamahanga Crescent Palmerston North / NZ | 04 /
SAMAL, Prabandha, Kumar 33 Abby Road, Aokautere Palmerston North / NZ | 05 /
SCHOFIELD, Rachel, Helen 21 Marriner Street Palmerston North / NZ | 06 /
HOLLAND, Ross 64A Batt Street Palmerston North / NZ | [2005/03] |
Former [2004/44] | 01 /
CROW, Vaughan, Leslie 15 Slacks Road Palmerston North / NZ | ||
02 /
HAYES, Michelle 196B Ferguson Street Palmerston North / NZ | |||
03 /
CURRY, Brian, James 103 Ruamahanga Crescent Palmerston North / NZ | |||
04 /
SAMAL, Prabandha, Kumar 55 College Street Palmerston North / NZ | |||
05 /
SCHOFIELD, Rachel, Helen 21 Marriner Street Palmerston North / NZ | |||
06 /
HOLLAND, Ross 64A Batt Street Palmerston North / NZ | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02792116.2 | 02.12.2002 | [2004/44] | WO2002NZ00266 | Priority number, date | NZ20010515881 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: NZ 51588101 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047358 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1469738 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469738 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23C20/00, A23L1/23, A23L1/30, C12N1/20, A23J3/34, C12R1/40, C12R1/44, C12R1/46, A23C19/06, A23C19/032, C12P21/06, C12P1/04 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
A23J3/344 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23L27/25 (EP,US);
C12P1/04 (EP,US);
C12P21/06 (EP,US);
C12R2001/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | A23C20/00, A23L1/23, A23L1/30, C12N1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄSEGESCHMACKSZUTAT UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2004/44] | English: | CHEESE FLAVOUR INGREDIENT AND METHOD OF ITS PRODUCTION | [2004/44] | French: | SUBSTANCE AROMATIQUE DE FROMAGE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2008 | BE | 30.01.2008 | CY | 30.01.2008 | CZ | 30.01.2008 | EE | 30.01.2008 | FI | 30.01.2008 | IT | 30.01.2008 | SI | 30.01.2008 | SK | 30.01.2008 | TR | 30.01.2008 | BG | 30.04.2008 | SE | 30.04.2008 | GR | 01.05.2008 | ES | 11.05.2008 | PT | 30.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IT | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
TR | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IT | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 11.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO02085131 (NEW ZEALAND DAIRY BOARD [NZ], et al) [PX] 1-9,11-17,21* example 10; claims 1,26,27,29-35,38-41,49,50 * | International search | [X]JPS52128286 ; | [X]GB930107 (GIUSEPPE CARLO SIGURTA); | [X]GB1449279 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA); | [A]US4172900 (DOOLEY J GORDON [US]); | [X]EP0137536 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]); | JPS61274663 [ ] (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [X]US4675193 (BOUDREAUX DONALD P [US]); | [X]US4708876 (YOKOYAMA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0508701 (QUEST INT [NL]); | [X]WO9935240 (ERBER ERICH KG [AT], et al); | [A]US6054151 (KWON STEVEN SOON-YOUNG [US], et al); | [X] - CA, Database accession no. 106:83290, XP002980784 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 49, Database accession no. 1977-87396Y, XP002980768 & JPS52128286 A 19770000 (TANABE SEIYAKU KK) |