EP1368692 - SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING HIGH-POWER BEAM CONTROL WITH ADAPTIVE OPTICS IN LOW POWER BEAM PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/50] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFECTING HIGH-POWER BEAM CONTROL WITH ADAPTIVE OPTICS IN LOW POWER BEAM PATH | ||
[2004/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY PO Box 902 2000 East El Segundo Blvd. El Segundo California 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Raytheon Company PO Box 902, 2000 El Segundo Blvd. El Segundo, California 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYREN, Robert, W. 2001 Agnes Road Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | 02 /
TRAFTON, Alvin, F. 2100 Chestnut Avenue Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02792182.4 | 26.09.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US30765 | Priority number, date | US20010965764 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 965764 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03027749 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1368692 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368692 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G02B26/06 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F41H13/0043 (EP,US);
G02B26/06 (EP,US);
G02B27/0037 (EP,US);
G02B27/4233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | G02B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/45] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR HOCHLEISTUNGSSTRAHL-KONTROLLE MIT ADAPTIVER OPTIK IM LEISTUNGSARMEN STRAHLENGANG | [2004/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING HIGH-POWER BEAM CONTROL WITH ADAPTIVE OPTICS IN LOW POWER BEAM PATH | [2004/41] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE FAISCEAU DE GRANDE PUISSANCE AU MOYEN D'UNE OPTIQUE ADAPTATIVE DANS UN TRAJET DE FAISCEAU DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2004/41] |
Former [2003/50] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHLEISTUNGSSTRAHL-KONTROLLE MIT ADAPTIVER OPTIK IM LEISTUNGSARMEN STRAHLENGANG | ||
Former [2003/50] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFECTING HIGH-POWER BEAM CONTROL WITH ADAPTIVE OPTICS IN LOW POWER BEAM PATH | ||
Former [2003/50] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE FAISCEAU DE GRANDE PUISSANCE AU MOYEN D'UNE OPTIQUE ADAPTATIVE DANS UN TRAJET DE FAISCEAU DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4321550 (EVTUHOV VIKTOR) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4326800 (FITTS JOHN M) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *; | [DA]US4798462 (BYREN ROBERT W [US]) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 46 - column 7, line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]US4996412 (ANAFI DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0952642 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 11 - column 8, line 10; figures 4,5 *; | [A] - MA S ET AL, "ATMOSPHERIC-TURBULENCE COMPENSATION WITH SELF-REFERENCED BINARY HOLOGRAPHIC INTERFEROMETRY", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA - A, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (1994), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 1084-7529, pages 428 - 433, XP000418849 [A] 1 * pages 428-429; figure 1 * |