EP1540758 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR BALANCED CONTROL OF BACKUP POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proton Energy Systems, Inc. 10, Technology Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCLUSKEY, Donald 30 Beechwood Road West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | 02 /
PORTER, Stephen 1011 Stafford Avenue Briston, CT 06010 / US | 03 /
SPANER, Michael 15 High Street Deep River, CT 06417 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02792189.9 | 11.10.2002 | [2005/24] | WO2002US32650 | Priority number, date | US20020410413P | 13.09.2002 Original published format: US 410413 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004025765 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540758 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M16/00, H02J9/06, G05B19/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01M16/003 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P90/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSGEGLICHENEN STEUERUNG VON RESERVESTROM | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR BALANCED CONTROL OF BACKUP POWER | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYYSTEME POUR LE CONTROLE EQUILIBRE DE PUISSANCE ELECTRIQUE DE SECOURS | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 03.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 25.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5334463 (TAJIMA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [A]US5994793 (BOBRY HOWARD H [US]); | [A]US6288456 (CRATTY WILLIAM E [US]); | [AE]US6465910 (YOUNG DOUGLAS GIBBONS [US], et al); | [A]EP0782209 (FINMECCANICA SPA [IT]) |