EP1463820 - METHOD OF SCREENING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION 300 Longwood Avenue Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZON, Leonard, I. 6 Frost Circle Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | 02 /
STERN, Howard, M. 138 Winchester Street Newton, MA 02461 / US | 03 /
MURPHEY, Ryan Apartment 4, 1477 Beacon Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/41] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02792411.7 | 17.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002US40262 | Priority number, date | US20010341428P | 17.12.2001 Original published format: US 341428 P | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03052106 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463820 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C12N15/87, C12P21/00, A01K67/027, A01K67/033 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/5088 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/175 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/255 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/40 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0306 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0393 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING VON VERBINDUNGEN | [2004/41] | English: | METHOD OF SCREENING COMPOUNDS | [2004/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE DE COMPOSES | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0140273 (PARKER HUGHES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 7; examples 6,7; claims 7,12-16 *; | [X] - PETERSON RT, LINK BA, DOWLING JE, SCHREIBER SL., "Small molecule developmental screens reveal the logic and timing of vertebrate development.Peterson", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20001121), vol. 97, no. 24, pages 12965 - 12969, XP002430176 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.24.12965 | [X] - CULP P ET AL, High-frequency germ-line transmission of plasmid DNA sequences injected into fertilized zebrafish eggs, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, PAGE(S) 7953-7957, (199109), ISSN 0027-8424, XP002135860 [X] 1-5,8-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.18.7953 | [PX] - AMATRUDA JF, SHEPARD JL, STERN HM, ZON LI., "Zebrafish as a cancer model system.", CANCER CELL., (200204), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 229 - 231, XP002430177 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1535-6108(02)00052-1 | [PX] - JORDAN T. SHIN AND MARK C. FISHMAN, "FROM ZEBRAFISH TO HUMAN: Modular Medical Models", ANNUAL REVIEW OF GENOMICS AND HUMAN GENETICS, (20020612), vol. 3, pages 311 - 340, XP002430178 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.genom.3.031402.131506 | [PX] - GERHARD GS, CHENG KC., "A call to fins! Zebrafish as a gerontological model.", AGING CELL, (20021201), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 104 - 111, XP002430179 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1474-9728.2002.00012.x | [PX] - TOMASIEWICZ HG, FLAHERTY DB, SORIA JP, WOOD JG., "Transgenic zebrafish model of neurodegeneration.", J NEUROSCI RES., (20021215), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 734 - 7445, XP002430184 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.10451 | [PX] - WHITFIELD TT., "Zebrafish as a model for hearing and deafness.", J NEUROBIOL., (20021105), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 157 - 171, XP002430185 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/neu.10123 | International search | [Y]US6015670 (GOODFELLOW PETER N [GB]); | [YE]US6379961 (JESSELL THOMAS M [US], et al); | [YE]US6429354 (SCOTT MATTHEW P [US], et al); | [YE]US6489127 (DUYK GEOFFREY [US], et al); | [Y] - WANG ET AL., "A zebrafish model for hepatoerythropoietic porphyria", NATURE GENETICS, (199811), vol. 20, pages 239 - 243, XP002963283 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/3030 | [Y] - GRUNWALD ET AL., "Headwaters of the zebrafish - emergence of a new model vertebrate", NATURE, (200209), vol. 3, pages 717 - 724, XP008016424 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg892 | [Y] - DOOLEY ET AL., "Zebrafish: a model system for the study of the human disease", CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (200006), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 252 - 256, XP002223557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-437X(00)00074-5 | [X] - "Chembridge corporation", URL: http://chembridge.com, XP002963284 |