EP1501470 - ONE STEP PERMANENT COSMETIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Junghyun No. 206 Ga-dong Seongsin Apt. 668-4 Jowon-dong Jangan-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-846 / KR | [2010/29] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Park, Junghyun No. 206 Ga-dong, Seongsin Apt., 668-4 Jowon-dong, Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 440-846 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Byung-Man 301-ho, 207-8, Sanbon 2-dong Gunpo-si 435-042, Kyunggi-do / KR | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Irniger, Ernst Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Irniger, Ernst Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG, Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 02793549.3 | 28.12.2002 | [2005/05] | WO2002KR02470 | Priority number, date | KR20020003088 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: KR 2002003088 | [2005/05] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03059300 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1501470 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501470 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/04, A61K8/40 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61Q5/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | A61K7/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSCHRITT-PERMANENTKOSMETIKZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/05] | English: | ONE STEP PERMANENT COSMETIC COMPOSITION | [2005/05] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE POUR PERMANENTE EN UNE ETAPE | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2002 | Translation filed | 22.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | 22.11.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2006 | 31.12.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | SE | 21.07.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | IE | 28.12.2010 | LU | 28.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | FR | 03.01.2011 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/47] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
IE | 28.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
NL | 21.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3768490 (KALOPISSIS G, et al) [X] 1-6,8* column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 20; examples 1,5,11,15,17,20 * | International search | [A]US4192863 (KONDO TOKUZO [JP]); | [A]US4832948 (KONDO TOKUZO [JP]); | [A]US4971080 (RUBINSTEIN ARNOLD [US], et al); | [A]EP0712623 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO9908650 (OREAL [FR]) |