EP1481239 - FLUID PRESENCE AND QUALITATIVE MEASUREMENTS BY TRANSIENT IMMITIVITY RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sampson, Allen R. 314 North 4th Street St. Charles, IL 60174 / US | For all designated states Davis, Robert, E. 125 Hillcrest Avenue Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02793954.5 | 18.11.2002 | [2004/49] | WO2002US36921 | Priority number, date | US20020087281 | 01.03.2002 Original published format: US 87281 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074998 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481239 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/02, G01R27/26, G01R27/08 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G01N27/221 (EP,US);
G01N27/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | 22.09.2004 | LT | 22.09.2004 | LV | 22.09.2004 | MK | 22.09.2004 | RO | 22.09.2004 | SI | 22.09.2004 | Title | German: | MESSUNGEN DES VORHANDENSEINS UND DER QUALITÄT VON FLUIDEN MITTELS TIR (TRANSIENT IMMITIVITY RESPONSE) | [2004/49] | English: | FLUID PRESENCE AND QUALITATIVE MEASUREMENTS BY TRANSIENT IMMITIVITY RESPONSE | [2004/49] | French: | PRESENCE DE FLUIDE ET MESURES QUALITATIVES PAR REPONSE D'IMMITIVITE TRANSITOIRE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 07.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6084417 (BERBERICH REINHOLD [DE]); | [Y]US5543717 (KORDAS NORBERT [DE]); | [Y]US5270663 (SANO YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) |