EP1450922 - CHEMICAL FEEDER, SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | CHEMICAL FEEDER | ||
[2007/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arch Chemicals, Inc. 501 Merritt 7, P.O. Box 5204 Norwalk, CT 06856-5204 / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Arch Chemicals, Inc. 501 Merritt 7, P.O. Box 5204 Norwalk, CT 06856-5204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANCHETTE, David, W. 87 Maplewood Road Southington, CT 06489 / US | 02 /
ZETENA, Christopher, M. 1735 Peachtree Street 333 Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | 03 /
PALOIAN, Michael Woodbury Road Cold Spring Harbor, NY 11724 / US | 04 /
ORCHARD, Anthony, R. 583 San Hill Road Wantagh, NY 11793 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02794158.2 | 03.12.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US38824 | Priority number, date | US20010338386P | 04.12.2001 Original published format: US 338386 P | US20020392727P | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 392727 P | US20020307671 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: US 307671 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047715 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450922 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450922 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01F1/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
C02F1/688 (EP,US);
B01F21/221 (EP,US);
E04H4/1281 (EP,US);
B01D37/025 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/76 (EP,US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2301/046 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | B01D11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUFÜHREINRICHTUNG FÜR CHEMISCHE SUBSTANZEN, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2007/46] | English: | CHEMICAL FEEDER, SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2007/46] | French: | DOSEUR DE REACTIF, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE | [2007/46] |
Former [2004/36] | ZUFÜHREINRICHTUNG FÜR CHEMISCHE SUBSTANZEN | ||
Former [2004/36] | CHEMICAL FEEDER | ||
Former [2004/36] | DOSEUR DE REACTIF | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08000157.1 / EP1900420 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/23] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]LU39470 (PIERRE SCHMITT-CLEES) [A] 1-34 * page 4, paragraph 6 * * figure . *; | [A]US4867196 (ZETENA CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 46 * * figures 3,5,6 *; | [XA]US5427748 (WIEDRICH CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,17,18,20,24-30,32 * column 3, line 28 - line 50 * * column 4, line 37 - line 55 * * column 6, line 32 - line 59 * * figure - * [A] 2,4,5,8-16,19,21-23,30,31,33,34; | [XA]US5660802 (ARCHER DAVID D [US], et al) [X] 33,34 * column 4, line 9 - line 37; figure - * [A] 1-32; | [A]US5765945 (PALMER PHILLIP M [US]) [A] 1-34* column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 5 * | International search | [A]US5536479 (MILLER STEVEN L [US], et al); | [X]US5765945 (PALMER PHILLIP M [US]) |