EP1451889 - SURFACE MOUNTED BROADSIDE DIRECTIONAL COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | [2008/43] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORODULIN, Dmitriy 8269 Lee Ct. Mason, OH 45040 / US | 02 /
DITTMER, Timothy 6044 Green Meadow Mason, OH 45040 / US | 03 /
CABRERA, George 8308 Cora Court Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02794859.5 | 12.08.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US25198 | Priority number, date | US20010932390 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: US 932390 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03017414 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1451889 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451889 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/18 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H01P5/187 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | H01P1/00, H01P5/18 | ||
Former IPC [2004/36] | H01P1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/43] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMONTIERTER BREITSEITIG GEKOPPELTER RICHTKOPPLER | [2004/36] | English: | SURFACE MOUNTED BROADSIDE DIRECTIONAL COUPLER | [2004/36] | French: | COUPLEUR DIRECTIONNEL TRANSVERSAL MONTE EN SURFACE | [2008/22] |
Former [2004/36] | COUPLEUR DIRECTIONNEL LARGE MONTE EN SURFACE | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.10.2008 | [2009/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5539362 (CULLING MICHAEL J [GB]); | [Y]US4823097 (KONISHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) |