EP1450974 - DEVICE CONSISTING OF A HEATABLE CASTING VESSEL AND A LADLE FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Induga Industrieöfen und Giesserei-Anlagen GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Perthel-Strasse 64-66 50739 Köln / DE | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Induga Industrieöfen und Giesserei-Anlagen GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Perthel-Strasse 64-66 50739 Köln / DE | ||
For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPPS, Günter Fröbelstrasse 28 50767 Köln / DE | 02 /
KOPPENHÖFER, Ralph Kübelrainstrasse 44 74535 Mainhardt / DE | 03 /
SCHERER, Carmen Gottfried-Weigle-Strasse 1 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kaiserswerther Straße 215 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys., et al Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02794964.3 | 02.12.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002DE04407 | Priority number, date | DE20011059306 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10159306 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047792 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450974 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450974 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1450974 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/015, H05B6/24, F27B14/06, F27D11/06 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H05B6/24 (EP);
B22D41/00 (EP);
B22D41/015 (EP);
F27B14/061 (EP);
F27B2014/0843 (EP);
F27B2014/0862 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS HEIZBAREM GIESSGEFÄSS UND EINEM HEIZSTAND BESTEHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2004/36] | English: | DEVICE CONSISTING OF A HEATABLE CASTING VESSEL AND A LADLE FURNACE | [2004/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF CONSTITUE D'UN CUVE DE COULEE POUVANT ETRE CHAUFFEE ET D'UN FOUR-POCHE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 13.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.06.2005 | EE | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | FR | 15.06.2005 | GB | 15.06.2005 | IE | 15.06.2005 | IT | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | SI | 15.06.2005 | SK | 15.06.2005 | TR | 15.06.2005 | BG | 15.09.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | ES | 26.09.2005 | PT | 24.11.2005 | AT | 02.12.2005 | CY | 02.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
AT | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 02.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
IT | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
AT | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 02.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
AT | 02.12.2005 | ||
CY | 02.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
CY | 02.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CZ | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
GB | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1795842 (RYLAND DAVIS NEVILLE) [Y] 1-5,7,9-11 * page 1, line 54 - page 2, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE1092575 (WILD BARFIELD ELECTR FURNACES) [Y] 1-5,7,9-11 * column 1, line 34 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE1136435 (AEG, et al) [Y] 1-5,7,9-11 * column 3, line 31 - line 38; figures 1,2; claim 6 *; | [XD]DE2035221 (DEUTSCHE EDELSTAHLWERKE AG) [XD] 1,2,11 * column 1, line 1 - line 14 * * column 2, line 23 - line 42 * * claims 1,3 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3910777 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract ** page 1, line 36 - line 37; figures 2-5 *; | [Y]DE4035552 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,7-11 * abstract * * column 4, line 24 - line 42 * * column 5, line 42 - line 65 * * figures 1,3-5 *; | [Y]EP0612201 (INDUCTOTHERM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 27 - page 6, line 39 * * page 8, line 22 - line 23 * * figures 1,3,4,7,8,10 *; | [PY]DE20119657U (INDUGA INDUSTRIEOEFEN UND GIES [DE]) [PY] 1,7-11 * the whole document * |