EP1461589 - AIRPORT FEATURE DISPLAY SYSTEM AND DATA INTERCHANGE METHOD FOR CONFORMAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Aviation Systems LLC 3290 Patterson Avenue, SE Grand Rapids, MI 49512-1991 / US | [2008/19] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Smiths Aerospace, Inc. 3290 Patterson Avenue, S.E. Grand Rapids, MI 49512 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Randy, L. 186 Taos Avenue, N.E. Ada, MI 49301 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/17] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02795572.3 | 30.10.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US34734 | Priority number, date | US20010336752P | 04.12.2001 Original published format: US 336752 P | US20010337182P | 04.12.2001 Original published format: US 337182 P | US20010337192P | 04.12.2001 Original published format: US 337192 P | US20010337295P | 04.12.2001 Original published format: US 337295 P | US20020079649 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: US 79649 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048687 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461589 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1461589 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00, G08G5/06 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G01C23/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | G01C23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | FLUGHAFENMERKMALSANZEIGESYSTEM UND DATENAUSTAUSCHVERFAHREN FÜR DIE KONFORME ANZEIGE | [2004/40] | English: | AIRPORT FEATURE DISPLAY SYSTEM AND DATA INTERCHANGE METHOD FOR CONFORMAL DISPLAY | [2004/40] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE DE CARACTERISTIQUES D'AEROPORT ET PROCEDE D'ECHANGE DE DONNEES DESTINE A UN AFFICHEUR CONFORME | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12161082.8 / EP2474813 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.2013 | BE | 25.09.2013 | BG | 25.09.2013 | CY | 25.09.2013 | CZ | 25.09.2013 | DK | 25.09.2013 | EE | 25.09.2013 | ES | 25.09.2013 | FI | 25.09.2013 | IT | 25.09.2013 | MC | 25.09.2013 | NL | 25.09.2013 | SE | 25.09.2013 | SK | 25.09.2013 | TR | 25.09.2013 | IE | 30.10.2013 | LU | 30.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | GR | 26.12.2013 | PT | 27.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/29] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 25.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CA2264765 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,7-8,11 * abstract * * page 14, line 18 - line 20; figure 9 * * page 14, line 25 - line 27; figure 10 *; | [I]CA2311946 (HONEYWELL AG [DE]) [I] 1,6,8-10,12 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 9 * * page 3, lines 23,31,32 ** page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 8; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US6195609 (PILLEY HAROLD ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US5057835 (FACTOR RICHARD C [US], et al); | [Y]US5831570 (AMMAR DANNY F [US], et al); | [Y]US6112141 (BRIFFE MICHEL [FR], et al); | [Y]US5200902 (PILLEY HAROLD R [US]) | by applicant | CA2264765 | CA2311946 |