EP1458282 - RECANALIZATION OF OCCLUDED VESSEL USING MAGNETIC RESONANCE GUIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Center Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Center Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Scott R. 6950 County Road 10 Chaska, MN 55318 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Golkowsky, Stefan Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Golkowsky, Stefan Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02795804.0 | 10.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US39450 | Priority number, date | US20010017213 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: US 17213 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03051192 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1458282 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G01R33/285 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00422 (EP,US);
A61B2090/374 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKANALISATION VON EINEM VERSTOPFTEN BLUTGEFÄSS MIT FÜHRUNG DURCH MAGNETISCHE REZONNANZ | [2004/39] | English: | RECANALIZATION OF OCCLUDED VESSEL USING MAGNETIC RESONANCE GUIDANCE | [2004/39] | French: | RECANALISATION DE VAISSEAUX OCCLUS GUIDEE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 22.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5318025 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al) [A] 19,25,42,43 * columns 3-4; figures 1,2; claims 1-9 * * column 5, lines 60-65 *; | [X]US5792055 (MCKINNON GRAEME C [CH]) [X] 19 * sentences 43-55; figures 1,2; claims 1,13 *; | [A]WO9852461 (CARDIAC M R I INC [US], et al) [A] 19* claim 1 *; | [A]US5928145 (OCALI OGAN [US], et al) [A] 19,20 * figure 1; claim 57 *; | [A]WO0025672 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [A] 19,40-43 * figures 1-7; claims 26,27 *; | [PX]WO02085216 (SURGIVISION INC [US]) [PX] 19,20 * page 36, line 30 - page 31, line 6; figure 1; examples 8,9 * |