EP1463560 - RESERVOIR HOUSING HAVING A CONDUCTIVE REGION INTEGRALLY FORMED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1010 Joaquin Road Mountain View CA 94043 / US | [2009/16] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Wendy, A. 1071 West Riverside Way San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 02 /
KLEINER, Lothar, W. 295 Los Altos Court Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/41] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02795999.8 | 19.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002US41038 | Priority number, date | US20010343003P | 19.12.2001 Original published format: US 343003 P | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053514 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463560 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463560 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61M5/172, A61N1/32 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A61N1/0448 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49082 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49204 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESERVOIR-GEHÄUSE MIT EINER INTEGRIERTEN LEITENDEN REGION | [2004/41] | English: | RESERVOIR HOUSING HAVING A CONDUCTIVE REGION INTEGRALLY FORMED THEREIN | [2004/41] | French: | BOITIER RESERVOIR CONTENANT UNE ZONE CONDUCTRICE FORMEE DE MANIERE SOLIDAIRE A L'INTERIEUR | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08075049.0 / EP1916014 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.02.2009 | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/48] | BE | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | BE | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | BE | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | BE | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | BE | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | BE | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 11.02.2009 | |
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 11.02.2009 | |
SI | 11.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4731926 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) [X] 1,20* the whole document *; | [X]US4856188 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) [X] 1,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5167617 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) [X] 1,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5653682 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) [X] 1,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5976101 (SIBALIS DAN [US]) [X] 1,20 * column 3, lines 8-10; figures 1,5; claims 1,17 * |