EP1463998 - POWER REDUCTION IN A MEMORY BUS INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILCOX, Jeffrey 420 Ellis Circle Folsom, CA 95630 / US | 02 /
YOSEF, Noam c/o Intel Corp., 2200 Mission College Blvd.SC4-202 Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/41] | 01 /
WILCOX, Jeffrey 420 Ellis Circle Folsom, CA 95630 / US | ||
02 /
YOSEF, Noam 20 Henrietta Sold 34722 Haifa / IL | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02796125.9 | 31.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002US41742 | Priority number, date | US20020038960 | 02.01.2002 Original published format: US 38960 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03058467 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463998 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463998 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16, G06F1/32 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
G06F13/16 (EP,US);
G06F1/32 (KR);
G06F1/3225 (EP,US);
G06F1/3253 (EP,US);
G06F13/1668 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERBUSSCHNITTSTELLE MIT GERINGEM ENERGIEVERBRAUCH | [2004/41] | English: | POWER REDUCTION IN A MEMORY BUS INTERFACE | [2004/41] | French: | REDUCTION DE PUISSANCE DANS UNE INTERFACE DE BUS MEMOIRE | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.2005 | BE | 09.11.2005 | CH | 09.11.2005 | CZ | 09.11.2005 | EE | 09.11.2005 | FI | 09.11.2005 | FR | 09.11.2005 | IT | 09.11.2005 | LI | 09.11.2005 | NL | 09.11.2005 | SI | 09.11.2005 | SK | 09.11.2005 | TR | 09.11.2005 | CY | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | IE | 02.01.2006 | LU | 09.01.2006 | BG | 09.02.2006 | DK | 09.02.2006 | GR | 09.02.2006 | SE | 09.02.2006 | ES | 20.02.2006 | PT | 10.04.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
IT | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SI | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 31.12.2005 | ||
FR | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
IE | 02.01.2006 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
IT | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SI | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
IE | 02.01.2006 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SI | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
IE | 02.01.2006 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
EE | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SI | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
IE | 02.01.2006 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SI | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
IE | 02.01.2006 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SI | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
IE | 02.01.2006 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 09.02.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SK | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07320483 ; | [YA]US5737746 (HARDIN JENNEFER S [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10,12-19,21-25 * column 2, line 53 - line 63 * * column 4, line 60 - line 64 * * column 5, line 53 - line 59 * * claim 1 * * abstract * [A] 4,11,20,26; | [XA]US6058059 (HUANG SHIH-HUANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-18,20-24,26 * column 1, line 15 - line 27 * * column 1, line 46 - line 50 * * column 2, line 39 - line 49 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 22 * [A] 4,11,19,25; | [XA]US2001012233 (HIRABAYASHI OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-18,20-24,26 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0011] * * abstract * [A] 4,11,19,25; | [YA]US2001054135 (MATSUDA YOICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,12-19,21-25 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] * * abstract * [A] 4,11,20,26 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07320483 A 19951208 (NEC IC MICROCOMPUT SYST LTD) [A] 4 * abstract * |