EP1416785 - A NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARDI INTERNATIONAL A/S 38, Helgeshoj Allé 2630 Taastrup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states HARDI INTERNATIONAL A/S 38, Helgeshoj Alle 2630 Taastrup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORMAN, Thomas Magevej 10 DK-2670 Greve Strand / DK | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 02796189.5 | 13.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002DK00533 | Priority number, date | DK20010001211 | 13.08.2001 Original published format: DK 200101211 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017748 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416785 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416785 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01C23/00, B05B1/14, A01M7/00, B05B1/04 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A01C23/047 (EP,US);
A01C23/005 (EP,US);
B05B1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜSE | [2004/20] | English: | A NOZZLE | [2004/20] | French: | BUSE | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2002 | Translation filed | 28.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 20.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2005 | BE | 22.06.2005 | CH | 22.06.2005 | CZ | 22.06.2005 | EE | 22.06.2005 | ES | 22.06.2005 | FI | 22.06.2005 | LI | 22.06.2005 | NL | 22.06.2005 | SK | 22.06.2005 | TR | 22.06.2005 | CY | 13.08.2005 | LU | 13.08.2005 | IE | 15.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | BG | 22.09.2005 | GR | 22.09.2005 | SE | 22.09.2005 | PT | 29.11.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
ES | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
CY | 13.08.2005 | ||
IE | 15.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
ES | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 22.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3191871 (PALMER JOHN E); | [A]FR2188461 (BERTHOUD SA [FR]); | [A]EP0014670 (BERTHOUD SA [FR]); | [A]FR2568445 (DESMARQUEST CERAMIQUES TECH [FR]); | [A]US4824024 (BISHOP PAUL W [US], et al); | [A]WO9837974 (BTG INT LTD [GB], et al) |