|
05.03.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Opposition |
43 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
43 |
|
21.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.07.2018 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.04.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.04.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
16.04.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2018 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
19 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
159 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
24.06.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.07.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
17.12.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |