EP1452003 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A COMMUNICATION WITH MULTI-SERVER SERVICE PROVIDING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARLES, Olivier 104, rue Raymond Losserand F-75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
COMBES, Jean-Michel Résidence Le Rousseau Appt 215 4 place Jacques Madaule 92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | [2016/44] |
Former [2004/36] | 01 /
CHARLES, Olivier 104, rue Raymond Losserand F-75014 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
COMBES, Jean-Michel Rés. Le Rousseau, Apt 215, 4 place Jacques Madaule 92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/32] | Faivre Petit, Frédérique, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/11] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/10] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/36] | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Rémy, 191, rue Saint-Honoré 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02796889.0 | 02.12.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002FR04132 | Priority number, date | FR20010015605 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0115605 | [2004/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03049406 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452003 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452003 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/12 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/1014 (EP,US);
H04L67/1021 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER ÜBERTRAGUNG MIT MITTELN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES DIENSTES MIT MEHREREN SERVERN | [2004/36] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING A COMMUNICATION WITH MULTI-SERVER SERVICE PROVIDING MEANS | [2004/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UNE COMMUNICATION AVEC DES MOYENS DE FOURNITURE D'UN SERVICE A SERVEURS MULTIPLES | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | IE | 02.12.2016 | LU | 02.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | BG | 02.02.2017 | GB | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | DE | 01.07.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/14] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GB | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/30] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9748246 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1* page 9, line 10 - page 18, line 7 *; | [A]US5742598 (DUNN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 27 *; | [A]EP0865180 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 35 - column 14, line 3 *; | [A]WO0119053 (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 7, line 6 - page 9, line 25 * |