EP1465967 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR UPGRADING AND GASIFYING HEAVY HYDROCARBON FEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORMAT INDUSTRIES, LTD. P.O. Box 68 Yavne 70650 / IL | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RETTGER, Philip 2438 Shannon Lane Walnut Creek, CA 94598 / US | 02 /
GOLDSTEIN, Randall 26 Woodside Drive Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 03 /
ARNOLD, Jim Suite 106, 220 26th Avenue, S.W. Calgary, Alberta T2S 0M4 / CA | 04 /
BRONICKI, Yoram 23 Keren Kayemet Street Rehovot / IL | 05 /
FRIDAY, Robert, J. P.O. Box 1433 Grantham, NH 03753 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/42] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02796943.5 | 24.12.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002IL01032 | Priority number, date | US20010025996 | 26.12.2001 Original published format: US 25996 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060042 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1465967 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10G67/16, C10G69/14, B01D3/14 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
C10G49/007 (EP,US);
Y10S585/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VEREDELUNG UND VERGASUNG VON SCHWEREN KOHLENWASSERSTOFF-EINSATZSTOFFEN | [2004/42] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR UPGRADING AND GASIFYING HEAVY HYDROCARBON FEEDS | [2004/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER ET DE GAZEIFIER DE LOURDES CHARGES D'HYDROCARBURES | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0372652 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5935419 (KHAN MOTASIMUR RASHID [US], et al) [Y] 1-41* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4308128 (CUMMINGS DONALD R); | [X]US5598365 (SHOJI MASAKAZU [US]); | [Y]US5976361 (HOOD RICHARD L [US], et al); | [A]US6183627 (FRIDAY J ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US6241874 (WALLACE PAUL S [US], et al); | [A]US6274032 (HOOD RICHARD L [US], et al); | [A]US6274003 (FRIDAY J ROBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | US5958365 | US6241874 |