EP1513887 - REDUCING CONCENTRATION OF ORGANIC MATERIALS WITH SUBSTITUTED CYCLODEXTRIN COMPOUND IN POLYESTER PACKAGING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellresin Technologies, LLC 4567 West 80th Street Minneapolis, Minnesota 55437 / US | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Cellresin Technologies, LLC 4567 West 80th Street Minneapolis, Minnesota 55437 / US | ||
For all designated states INVISTA North America S.à.r.l. Talstrasse 80 8001 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Cellresin Technologies, LLC 4567 West 80th Street Minneapolis, Minnesota 55437 / US | ||
For all designated states Arteva North America S.A.R.L. Talstrasse 80 8001 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOD, Willard E. 3470 Siems Court Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | 02 /
BEAVERSON, Neil J. 417 Bear Avenue South Vadnais Heights, MN 55127 / US | 03 /
LAWONN, Philip A. 1899 20th Avenue Northwest New Bright, MN 55112 / US | 04 /
HUANG, Xiaoyan 430 Carleton Circle Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 02797244.7 | 09.12.2002 | [2005/11] | WO2002US39346 | Priority number, date | US20020163817 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: US 163817 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03104308 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513887 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513887 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1513887 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/20, C09D105/16, C08L67/02 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C09D105/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/203 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/22 (KR);
C08L5/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRATIONSREDUZIERUNG VON ORGANISCHEN STOFFEN MIT EINER CYKLODEXTRIN-SUBSTITUIERTEN VERBINDUNG IN POLYESTERHALTIGEN VERPACKUNGSMATERIALIEN | [2005/11] | English: | REDUCING CONCENTRATION OF ORGANIC MATERIALS WITH SUBSTITUTED CYCLODEXTRIN COMPOUND IN POLYESTER PACKAGING MATERIALS | [2005/11] | French: | REDUCTION DE LA CONCENTRATION DE MATIERES ORGANIQUES AVEC UN COMPOSE CYCLODEXTRINE SUBSTITUEE DANS DES MATERIAUX D'EMBALLAGE EN POLYESTER | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2008 | CZ | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | IE | 09.12.2008 | LU | 09.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | [2018/43] |
Former [2015/36] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
TR | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2012/44] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
TR | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
TR | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
TR | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
TR | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 01.10.2008 | |
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | SI | 01.10.2008 | |
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0102489 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-56 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 21 ** examples *; | [X]US2002006991 (WOOD WILLARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-56 * examples, claims; paragraphs [0017] - [0041]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP1291383 |