EP1455657 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE MULTI-AXIAL PLACEMENT OF SURGICAL FASTENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eva Corporation Hugh Trout, M. D., III, 8218 Wisconsin Avenue Nr. 204 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trout, Hugh H., III 8218 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 204 Bethesdal, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
TANNER, Howard, M. 242 E. 100 South Logan, UT 84321 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02797426.0 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US40645 | Priority number, date | US20010341852P | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 341852 P | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03059147 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455657 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00247 (EP,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0649 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22068 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22069 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22074 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22077 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE MULTIAXIALE PLATZIERUNG VON CHIRURGISCHEN BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTEN | [2004/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE MULTI-AXIAL PLACEMENT OF SURGICAL FASTENERS | [2004/38] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE POUR PLACEMENT MULTIAXIAL D'ATTACHES CHIRURGICALES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6190353 (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,14,18-20,23,25,32,35,37 * figures 6a-6i,7a-7m,12a-12d,13a-13e * * column 15, line 41 - line 54 * * column 22, line 13 - line 38 * * column 32, line 4 - line 36 * * column 34, line 49 - column 35, line 2 * * column 36, line 57 - column 37, line 24 * * column 50, line 30 - column 51, line 25 *[Y] 10-13,15-17,27-30,33; | [X]WO0158364 (EVA CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-20,23-31,33-42 * abstract * * figures 13-17,24,25 * * page 16, line 25 - page 20, line 28 * * page 24, line 3 - page 27, line 25 * * page 29, line 28 - line 32 * * page 41, line 3 - line 11 *; | [XY]WO0160432 (EVA CORP [US]) [X] 35-42 * page 7, line 17 - line 25 * * figures 1-9 * * page 7, line 17 - line 25 * * page 8, line 3 - line 26 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 27 * [Y] 10-13,15-17,27-30,33 | International search | [A]US5904697 (GIFFORD III HANSON S [US], et al) |