EP1485867 - CONTACT SMART CARDS HAVING A DOCUMENT CORE CONTACTLESS SMART CARDS INCLUDING MULTI-LAYERED STRUCTURE PET-BASED IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENT AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L-1 Secure Credentialing, Inc. C/o Corporation Service Company c/o Corporation Service Company 2711 Centerville Road Wilmington, Delaware / US | [2011/02] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Digimarc ID Systems, LLC 19801 SW 72nd Avenue, Suite 250 Tualatin, OR 97062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Robert 1 Coventry Lane Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Joseph 56 Haverhill Rd. Salem, NH 03079 / US | 03 /
BI, Daoshen 58 Loring Avenue Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | 04 /
REGAN, Thomas Seabrook, NH x / US | 05 /
MAILLOUX, Dennis 38 Church Street Westminster, MA 01473 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Coehn, Markus Fish & Richardson P.C. High Light Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/15] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Meddle, Alan Leonard Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02797484.9 | 23.12.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002US41320 | Priority number, date | US20010344673P | 24.12.2001 Original published format: US 344673 P | US20010344717P | 24.12.2001 Original published format: US 344717 P | US20010344719P | 24.12.2001 Original published format: US 344719 P | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03056499 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1485867 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/07722 (EP,US);
G06K19/07728 (EP,US);
G06K19/07745 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
B23C2210/0442 (EP,US);
B32B2305/342 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (EP,US);
B32B2425/00 (EP,US);
B32B2519/02 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | G06K15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKT-CHIPKARTEN MIT EINEM DOKUMENTKERN, KONTAKTLOSE CHIPKARTEN MIT IDENTIFIKATIONSDOKUMENT MEHRSCHICHTIGER STRUKTUR AUF PET-BASIS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/51] | English: | CONTACT SMART CARDS HAVING A DOCUMENT CORE CONTACTLESS SMART CARDS INCLUDING MULTI-LAYERED STRUCTURE PET-BASED IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENT AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME | [2004/51] | French: | CARTES A PUCE A CONTACT AYANT UN NOYAU DOCUMENT ET CARTES A PUCE SANS CONTACT COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE, UN DOCUMENT D'IDENTIFICATION A BASE DE PET, ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0778542 (WATADA PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,10-13,17,18 * page 4, column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 54; figure 4(b); claim . *; | [A]EP0789323 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,18 * page 2, column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 3; figure 1 *; | [X]US5846900 (REITER THOMAS CARL [US], et al) [X] 21* claims 1-5 *; | [I]EP0913268 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [I] 20 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0089]; figures 14,15 *; | [A]WO9924934 (SUPERCOM LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,18,20 * page 18, line 3 - line 10; figures 3,8-10; claims 1,12,21 *; | [A]US5969951 (FISCHER DIRK [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,10,11,13,15,18 * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 59; figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO0103061 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES S A [FR], et al) [A] 1,18 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 15; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US6250555 (INAMOTO TADAYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1,3-7,10-13,17,18 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 8; figures 2,3,6,7,8; example 3; claims 1,4,6 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 30 *; | [A]US2001012682 (KAYANAKIS GEORGES [FR], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031]; figure 4; claims 1,9 *; | [XA]US6301119 (THEVENOT BENOIT [FR], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 13; figures 2,3,5 * [A] 18 | International search | [YP]US6357664 (ZERCHER JOHN MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US5681356 (BARAK RENEE-LUCIA [DE], et al); | [Y]US5304513 (HAGHIRI-TEHRANI YAHYA [DE], et al) | by applicant | US6250555 | EP0778542 | US6301119 | EP0913268 | US5846900 |