EP1425584 - IMPROVED MASS SPECTROMETRIC ANALYSIS USING NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMUCKER, Jürgen Giesekingstrasse 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
SCHIESTEL, Thomas Darwinstrasse 8b 70565 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
BRUNNER, Herwig An der Betteleiche 6 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
TOVAR, Günter Oberer Grundweg 25 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Schrell, Andreas Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Schrell, Andreas, Dr. Gleiss & Grosse Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02797583.8 | 16.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002EP09196 | Priority number, date | DE20011044250 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10144250 | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03021267 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425584 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/54346 (EP,US);
G01N2458/15 (EP,US);
Y10T436/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE MASSENSPEKTROMETRISCHE ANALYSE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NANOPARTIKELN | [2004/24] | English: | IMPROVED MASS SPECTROMETRIC ANALYSIS USING NANOPARTICLES | [2004/24] | French: | ANALYSE SPECTROMETRIQUE DE MASSE AMELIOREE, EFFECTUEE A L'AIDE DE NANOPARTICULES | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5922537 (EWART THOMAS G [CA], et al) [X] 20 * abstract * * column 5, line 29 - line 42 * * column 6, line 51 - line 67 * * column 7, line 39 - line 53 * * table 1 *; | [X]US6056877 (GJERDE DOUGLAS T [US], et al) [X] 20 * abstract * * column 16, line 34 *; | [X]WO9629431 (SEQUENOM INC [US]) [X] 1,20,40,43 * abstract * * example 9 * * claims 1,6,10 *; | [X]US6277573 (KOESTER HUBERT [US]) [X] 1,20,40,43 * abstract * * claims 1,4,6,11 * |