EP1423157 - STABILIZING CATHETER FOR PROTEIN DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325 / US | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ANTWERP, William, P. 26833 Pinehurst Drive Valencia, CA 91355 / US | 02 /
GULATI, Poonam 5467 La Forest Drive La Canada, CA 91011 / US | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
VAN ANTWERP, William, P. 24101 West Del Monte, 418 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | ||
02 /
GULATI, Poonam 5467 La Forest Drive La Canada, CA 91011 / US | Representative(s) | White, Nicholas John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | White, Nicholas John, et al MARKS & CLERK 43 Park Place Leeds, LS1 2RY / GB | ||
Former [2004/23] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 02797852.7 | 03.09.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US28172 | Priority number, date | US20010317256P | 05.09.2001 Original published format: US 317256 P | US20010035831 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 35831 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03020336 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1423157 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L33/06 (EP,US);
A61L2300/252 (EP,US);
A61L2300/43 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERENDER KATHETER FÜR DIE ABGABE EINES PROTEIN-ARZNEIMITTELS | [2004/23] | English: | STABILIZING CATHETER FOR PROTEIN DRUG DELIVERY | [2004/23] | French: | CATHETERS DE STABILISATION POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE PROTEINE-MEDICAMENT | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/37] | Request for further processing for: | 08.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4536179 (ANDERSON MICHAEL H [US], et al) [X] 1-86 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 24 *; | [AD]WO9819627 (MINIMED INC [US]) [AD] 86* the whole document *; | [X]US5797887 (ROSEN GERALD M [US], et al) [X] 1-86 * claims 1,11 *; | [AD]WO0072896 (MINIMED INC [US]) [AD] 1-86 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5428123 (WARD ROBERT S [US], et al); | [A]US5529914 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]US5573934 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]US5723588 (DONOFRIO DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US5733524 (BUCALA RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]US5874277 (SHINTANI YASUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5922161 (WU DONG YANG [AU], et al) |