EP1425268 - ORGANIC SULFATES AS IONIC LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2011 | Deletion: Fee for printing new specification paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/14] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Solvent Innovation GmbH Nattermannallee 1 50829 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Solvent Innovation GmbH Alarichstrasse 14-16 50679 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSERSCHEID, Peter Grevenbroicher Str. 2 50829 Köln / DE | 02 /
BÖSMANN, Andreas Düppelstr. 118 52068 Aachen / DE | 03 /
VAN HAL, Roy Anjerstraat 8 NL-6451 HD Schienveld / NL | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/19] |
Former [2004/24] | Weber, Thomas Dr., et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02797984.8 | 11.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002EP10206 | Priority number, date | DE20011045747 | 17.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145747 | [2005/03] |
Former [2004/24] | DE20011045747 | 12.09.2001 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022812 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425268 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425268 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1425268 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/32 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE SULFATE ALS IONISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2004/24] | English: | ORGANIC SULFATES AS IONIC LIQUIDS | [2004/24] | French: | SULFATES ORGANIQUES EN TANT QUE LIQUIDES IONIQUES | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 15.01.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.05.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | LU | 11.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
LU | 11.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
LU | 11.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 07.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | CS111918 [ ]; | [X]GB1050791 (PROCTR & GAMBLE LTD.) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1-13; table I *; | [X]JPH05178798 ; | [X]GB1440238 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO9940025 (ACEP INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-28 *; | [Y]US6245918 (OLIVIER HELENE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-20 *; | [PY]EP1182196 (SOLVENT INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [PY] 1-17 * claims 1-15 *; | [PY]EP1182197 (SOLVENT INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [PY] 1-17 * claims 1-12 *; | [X] - J. KLOUBEK, P. KONDELIK, "Alkyl esters of sulfuric acid and their salts", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19650412), vol. 62, no. 8, Database accession no. 9012a, XP002224891 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 4171557, XP002224892 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [ ] - CORKILL ET AL., TRANS. FARADAY SOC., (1966), vol. 62, page 987 | [X] - ., CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 3643077, XP002224893 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [ ] - Z.-J. YU ET AL, J. PHYS. CHEM., (1990), vol. 94, no. 9, pages 3675 - 3681 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 6709453,6709293,6709083,6708828,6708655, XP002224894 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - A. PACKTER, M. DONBROW, J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1963), vol. 15, pages 317 - 324 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 3643865, XP002224895 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - MEGURO, KONDO, NIPPON KAGAKU ZASSHI, (1959), vol. 80, page 818 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 7847922, XP002224896 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - V. TOMASIC ET AL., BER. BUNSEN-GES. PHYS. CHEM., (1997), vol. 101, no. 12, pages 1942 - 1948 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 6465924, XP002224897 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - P. JOKELA ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1987), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 3291 - 3298 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 3814288, XP002224898 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - I. M. CUCCOVIA ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. 2, (2000), no. 9, pages 1896 - 1907 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 3862916,3823539,3821574,3808539, XP002224899 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [ ] - BOLLE, BOURGEOIS, MEM. SERVICES CHIM., (1953), vol. 38, page 159 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 8461725, XP002224900 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - A. A. ABRAMZON, ZH. PRIKL. KHIM. (LENINGRAD), (1999), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 666 - 669 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 3800408, XP002224901 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - J. B. S. BONILHA ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1989), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 367 - 372 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931029), vol. 017, no. 594, & JP05178798 A 19930720 (KAO CORP.) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [X] - B. GUILLOTEAU-BERTIN ET AL., "Stereocontrolled Alkylation of Chiral Pyridinium Salt Toward a Short Enantioselective Access to 2-Alkyl- and 2,6-Dialkyl-1,2,5,6-Tetrahydropyridines", EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2000), no. 8, pages 1391 - 1399, XP002224904 [X] 1,2,5 * Compound of formula 1b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0690(200004)2000:8<1391::AID-EJOC1391>3.0.CO;2-D | Opposition | WO0016902 |