EP1425133 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CRYOGENIC COOLING FOR HIGH-ENERGY CUTTING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZURECKI, Zbigniew 2660 Fieldview Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 02 /
SWAN, Robert, Bruce 7465, School Road Bath, PA 18014 / US | 03 /
FREY, John, Herbert 1627 Fieldstone Street Allentown, PA 18106 / US | 04 /
HARRIOTT, George, Matthew 6140 Cameo Drive Allentown, PA 18104 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoguang 2437 Dubonnet Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | [2004/25] |
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
ZURECKI, Zbigniew 2660 Fieldview Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | ||
02 /
SWAN, Robert, Bruce 307 Jefferson Street Lehighton, PA 18235 / US | |||
03 /
FREY, John, Herbert 1627 Fieldstone Street Allentown, PA 18106 / US | |||
04 /
HARRIOTT, George, Matthew 6140 Cameo Drive Allentown, PA 18104 / US | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoguang 2437 Dubonnet Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02798097.8 | 29.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002US27548 | Priority number, date | US20010951195 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: US 951195 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03022517 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425133 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425133 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1425133 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B23Q11/1053 (EP,US);
B23Q11/10 (KR);
B23Q17/09 (EP,US);
B23Q17/24 (EP,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,US);
F17C2221/016 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0443 (EP,US);
Y10T407/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN MITTELS EINER KRYOGENEN FLÜSSIGKEIT BEIM SCHNEIDEN MIT HOHER ENERGIE | [2004/24] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CRYOGENIC COOLING FOR HIGH-ENERGY CUTTING OPERATIONS | [2004/24] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT CRYOGENIQUE POUR DES OPERATIONS DE DECOUPE D'ENERGIE ELEVEE | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.09.2009 | 28.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2010 | BE | 03.03.2010 | CY | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | IE | 29.08.2010 | LU | 29.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.08.2010 | ||
LU | 29.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
BE | 03.03.2010 | ||
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 03.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09300172 ; | [A]JP2000210837 ; | [X]GB784504 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-14,18,19,22,23,25,28,30-36,38-40 * page 1, line 9 - line 16 * * page 1, line 34 - line 71 * * page 2, line 43 - line 46 * * page 3, line 39 - line 44 * * page 3, line 58 - line 62 *; | [A]US3077802 (BRUCE PHILIP THOMAS) [A] 1,11,14,20,22,32,35,36,38,41,42 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [DX]US3971114 (DUDLEY GEORGE M) [DX] 1,2,8-14,18,19,22,23,29-36,38-40 * column 2, line 38 - line 41 * * column 3, line 1 - line 3 *; | [A]GB1546590 (HENDERSON DIAMOND TOOL CO LTD) [A] 15-19,21,36-40,42* page 2, line 122 - line 126 *; | [DA]US4829859 (YANKOFF GERALD K [US]) [DA] 3,24,41,42 * column 5, line 7 - line 27 * * column 8, line 31 - line 57 *; | [X]DE4326517 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11-14,18,19,22,23,26,31-36,38-40 * column 1, line 14 - line 17 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 43 - line 51 * * column 4, line 6 - line 9 *; | [X]FR2724337 (ANHYDRIDE CARBONIQUE IND [FR]) [X] 1-4,10-14,18,19,22-25,32-36,38-42 * page 2, line 7 - line 18 * * page 4, line 13 - line 14 * * page 4, line 23 - line 27 *; | [DA]US5901623 (HONG SHANE Y [US]) [DA] 2,4,5,7,8,20,23,25,26,29 * column 5, line 47 - line 54 * * column 6, line 16 - line 22 * * column 6, line 43 - line 52 *; | [DX]WO9960079 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [DX] 1,11-14,18,19,22,32-36,38-40 * page 8, line 23 - line 26 * * page 9, line 15 - line 23 *; | [X]FR2804492 (CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE [FR]) [X] 1,7,11-14,18,19,22,28,32-36,38-40 * page 2, line 10 - line 19 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 10 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 14 - line 18 * * page 6, line 13 - line 14 *; | [E]WO02096598 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [E] 1-42 * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 12; claims 9,22 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09300172 A 19971125 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,8,11-14,18,19,22,29,32-36,38-40 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000210837 A 20000802 (YOKOGAWA KAZUHIKO;YAMADA TORATOSHI) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | US4829859 | WO9960079 |