EP1423612 - IMPROVED PITOT TUBE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envirotech Pumpsystems, Inc. P.O. Box 209, 440 West 800 South Salt Lake City, UT 84110-0209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Envirotech Pumpsystems, Inc. P.O. Box 209, 440 West 800 South Salt Lake City, UT 84110-0209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINN, Joel 1108 Chavez Drive South Jordan, UT 84092 / US | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02798141.4 | 06.09.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US28356 | Priority number, date | US20010318196P | 07.09.2001 Original published format: US 318196 P | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03023230 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423612 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F04D1/12, G01P5/16 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
F04D1/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/23] | F04D1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER PITOTROHREINSATZ | [2004/23] | English: | IMPROVED PITOT TUBE INSERT | [2004/23] | French: | PIECE RAPPORTEE PERFECTIONNEE TUBE DE PITOT | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 29.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2938391 (KOBE INC) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A]US4267964 (WILLIAMS CARTER P) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0272108 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9937923 (ENVIROTECH PUMPSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5997243 (SHAW JAMES G [US]); | [X]US4264269 (ERICKSON JOHN W, et al); | [A]US4267964 (WILLIAMS CARTER P); | [A]US3384023 (KING WILLIAM L, et al) |